EP1482563 - Transparent sealing material for photoelectrically active surfaces, method of production and related use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/49] | Transparent sealing material for for photoelectrically active surfaces, method of production and related use | ||
[2008/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Helmholtz-Zentrum Berlin für Materialien und Energie GmbH A-DM/Patente Hahn-Meitner-Platz 1 14109 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states Helmholtz-Zentrum Berlin für Materialien und Energie GmbH Glienicker Strasse 100 14109 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states Hahn-Meitner-Institut Berlin GmbH Glienicker Strasse 100 14109 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tributsch, Helmut Alsenstrasse 24 14109 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Rojas-Chapana, Jose Saemischstrasse 2 53113 Bonn / DE | 03 /
Küppers, Udo Hauptmann-Böse Weg 9 28213 Bremen / DE | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | Rudolph, Margit, et al Helmholtz-Zentrum Berlin für Materialien Und Energie GmbH Drittmittelmanagement/Patente Glienicker Strasse 100 14109 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | Rudolph, Margit, et al Hahn-Meitner-Institut Berlin GmbH KGF - PATENTE Glienicker Strasse 100 14109 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2004/49] | Rudolph, Margit, et al Hahn-Meitner-Institut Berlin GmbH, Glienicker Str. 100 14109 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 04090201.7 | 18.05.2004 | [2004/49] | Priority number, date | DE2003125149 | 31.05.2003 Original published format: DE 10325149 | [2004/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1482563 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1482563 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0203, H01L31/0216 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
H01L31/02167 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/49] | Title | German: | Transparentes Versiegelungsmaterial für lichtbestrahlte, photoelektronisch aktive Oberflächen, Verfahren zur Herstellung und Anwendung | [2004/49] | English: | Transparent sealing material for photoelectrically active surfaces, method of production and related use | [2008/07] | French: | Matériau d'étanchéité transparent pour surfaces photoélectriques, procédé de fabrication et application correspondante | [2004/49] |
Former [2004/49] | Transparent sealing material for for photoelectrically active surfaces, method of production and related use | Examination procedure | 05.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 21.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.05.2008 | CZ | 28.05.2008 | DK | 28.05.2008 | EE | 28.05.2008 | FI | 28.05.2008 | IE | 28.05.2008 | IT | 28.05.2008 | NL | 28.05.2008 | PL | 28.05.2008 | RO | 28.05.2008 | SI | 28.05.2008 | SK | 28.05.2008 | TR | 28.05.2008 | BG | 28.08.2008 | SE | 28.08.2008 | GR | 29.08.2008 | ES | 08.09.2008 | PT | 28.10.2008 | HU | 29.11.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 28.05.2008 | ||
IT | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
PL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
GR | 29.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
HU | 29.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/50] | CZ | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 28.05.2008 | ||
IT | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
PL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
GR | 29.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/24] | CZ | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 28.05.2008 | ||
IT | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
PL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CZ | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 28.05.2008 | ||
IT | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | CZ | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | DK | 28.05.2008 | |
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 28.05.2008 | |
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
IE | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 28.05.2008 | |
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | FI | 28.05.2008 | |
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | SI | 28.05.2008 | |
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 28.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6130448 (BAUER FRED T [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * column 4, line 44 - column 13, line 4; figures 2-5,8-10 *; | [A]EP1058320 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-22 * page 3, line 2 - page 17, line 3; figures 1-12 *; | [A]EP1202609 (ATOFINA CHEM INC [US]) [A] 1-22 * page 3, line 52 - page 16, line 28; figures 1,2 *; | [A] - KURKLU A ET AL, "Thermal performance of a water-phase change material solar collector", RENEWABLE ENERGY, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (200207), vol. 26, no. 3, ISSN 0960-1481, pages 391 - 399, XP004335604 [A] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-1481(01)00130-6 |