Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP1510479


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
31.07.2015 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  02.09.2015  [2015/36]
04.05.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2012  [2012/23]
25.09.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.10.2009  [2009/44]
28.08.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.09.2009  [2009/40]
28.11.2008 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  31.12.2008  [2009/01]
15.08.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.09.2008  [2008/38]
18.04.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.05.2008  [2008/21]
21.09.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2007  [2007/43]
13.07.2007 No opposition filed within time limit published on  15.08.2007  [2007/33]
29.06.2007 Correction of patent specification published on  01.08.2007  [2007/31]
15.06.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.2007  [2007/29]
01.06.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2007  [2007/27]
25.05.2007 Change - inventor published on  27.06.2007  [2007/26]
27.04.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.05.2007  [2007/22]
20.04.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2007  [2007/21]
09.03.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.04.2007  [2007/15]
04.08.2006 (Expected) grant published on  06.09.2006  [2006/36]
02.08.2006 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
02.08.2006 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
02.08.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.03.2006 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
07.10.2005 Definitive list of designations published on  23.11.2005  [2005/47]
16.09.2005 Request for examination filed published on  02.11.2005  [2005/44]
14.01.2005 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.03.2005  [2005/09]