EP1510479 - Conveying system, in particular an air port luggage conveying system, and control for the conveying system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: NL | published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brixius, Wolfgang Kreuzstr. 3 91077 Neunkirchen A.Br / DE | 02 /
Falkner, Bernhard Amrumer Str. 49 90425 Nürnberg / DE | 03 /
Gerle, Andreas Sudetenstr. 2b 91161 Hilpoltstein / DE | 04 /
Gräfer, Dominik Baststr. 9 44265 Dortmund-Wellinghofen / DE | 05 /
Hoene, Albrecht, Dr. Watzlikstrasse 12 93138 Lappersdorf / DE | 06 /
Hoffmann, Gerhard Höchstädter Strasse 4 90451 Nürnberg / DE | 07 /
Junk, Rainer, Dr. Birkenweg 4 91091 Grossenseebach / DE | 08 /
Schwarzbach, Klaus-Peter Gluckstrasse 15 90491 Nürnberg / DE | 09 /
Valencic, Gojko Jakob-Herz-Weg 18 91052 Erlangen / DE | 10 /
Ziegler, Roland Händelstrasse 24 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2007/26] |
Former [2005/09] | 01 /
Brixius, Wolfgang Kreuzstr. 3 91077 Neunkirchen A.Br / DE | ||
02 /
Falkner, Bernhard Amrumer Str. 49 90425 Nürnberg / DE | |||
03 /
Gerle, Andreas Sudetenstr. 2b 91161 Hilpoltstein / DE | |||
04 /
Gräfer, Dominik Baststr. 9 44265 Dortmund-Wellinghofen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04090303.1 | 29.07.2004 | [2005/09] | Priority number, date | DE2003139951 | 29.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10339951 | [2005/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1510479 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1510479 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/36] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1510479 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/50 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
B65G47/50 (EP,US);
B64F1/368 (EP,US);
B65G43/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/09] | Title | German: | Fördersystem, insbesondere eine Flughafengepäckförderanlage, und eine Steuerung für ein solches Fördersystem | [2005/09] | English: | Conveying system, in particular an air port luggage conveying system, and control for the conveying system | [2005/09] | French: | Système transporteur, en particulier un tapis de transport de valises pour aéroport, et équipement de commande pour le système de transport | [2005/09] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 27.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.09.2006 | CZ | 06.09.2006 | EE | 06.09.2006 | FI | 06.09.2006 | IE | 06.09.2006 | PL | 06.09.2006 | RO | 06.09.2006 | SI | 06.09.2006 | SK | 06.09.2006 | TR | 06.09.2006 | BG | 06.12.2006 | SE | 06.12.2006 | GR | 07.12.2006 | PT | 19.02.2007 | HU | 07.03.2007 | [2015/36] |
Former [2012/23] | CY | 06.09.2006 | |
CZ | 06.09.2006 | ||
EE | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
PL | 06.09.2006 | ||
RO | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SK | 06.09.2006 | ||
TR | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
HU | 07.03.2007 | ||
Former [2009/44] | CY | 06.09.2006 | |
CZ | 06.09.2006 | ||
EE | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
PL | 06.09.2006 | ||
RO | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SK | 06.09.2006 | ||
TR | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
HU | 07.03.2007 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CY | 06.09.2006 | |
CZ | 06.09.2006 | ||
EE | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
PL | 06.09.2006 | ||
RO | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SK | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2009/01] | CZ | 06.09.2006 | |
EE | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
PL | 06.09.2006 | ||
RO | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SK | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 06.09.2006 | |
EE | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
PL | 06.09.2006 | ||
RO | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SK | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 06.09.2006 | |
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
PL | 06.09.2006 | ||
RO | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SK | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | CZ | 06.09.2006 | |
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
PL | 06.09.2006 | ||
RO | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SK | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | CZ | 06.09.2006 | |
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
PL | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SK | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 06.09.2006 | |
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
PL | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 06.09.2006 | |
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
PL | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | FI | 06.09.2006 | |
PL | 06.09.2006 | ||
SI | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2028836 (SIEMENS AG) [AD] 1-11 * page 19, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 23, paragraph 4 - page 27, paragraph 3 * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]US3908113 (MAXHAM KENNETH Y, et al) [A] 1-11 * column 2, line 11 - line 46 * * column 6, line 4 - line 29 * * column 7, line 13 - line 35 * * column 10, line 22 - line 67; figures 1-9 *; | [A]DE3434268 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11* page 11, line 20 - page 12, line 35; figure 1 *; | [A]WO8706551 (PROGRAMMATION INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 6, paragraph 5 - page 7, paragraph 2; figure 19 *; | [AD]DE4116283 (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-11 * column 7, line 31 - line 49 * * column 8, line 39 - column 9, line 57 * * figures 1-3,10-13 * |