EP1633088 - Method and device for improving quality-of-service management in peer-to-peer networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEUTSCHE THOMSON-BRANDT GMBH Hermann-Schwer-Strasse 3 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [2006/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klausberger, Wolfgang Am Uhrturm 26 30519 Hannover / DE | 02 /
Blawat, Meinolf Sutelstrasse 54 C 30659 Hannover / DE | 03 /
Kubsch, Stefan Im Ohr 2 31559 Hohnhorst / DE | 04 /
Li, Hui Haltenhoffstrasse 221 30419 Hannover / DE | 05 /
Hepper, Dietmar Wernigeroder Weg 41 30419 Hannover / DE | [2006/10] | Representative(s) | Rittner, Karsten, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Rittner, Karsten, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2006/10] | Rittner, Karsten, et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 04090339.5 | 02.09.2004 | [2006/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1633088 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04L29/08 | [2006/10] | CPC: |
H04L47/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04L47/24 (KR);
H04L47/2458 (EP,US);
H04L47/283 (EP,US);
H04L47/748 (EP,US);
H04L47/80 (KR);
H04L47/828 (EP,US);
H04L67/104 (EP,US);
H04L67/1085 (EP,US);
H04L67/61 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/46] |
Former [2006/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verbesserung des Dienstgüte-Managements in Peer-to-Peer-Netzen | [2006/10] | English: | Method and device for improving quality-of-service management in peer-to-peer networks | [2006/10] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour ameliorer la gestion de qualité de service dans des réseaux peer-to-peer | [2006/10] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/21] | 05.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.10.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.10.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1229442 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0041] - [0062]; figure 2 *; | [A] - KING M ET AL, "Transforming the reliability, security and scalability of it communications through the pervasive deployment of serverless software infrastructure", SECOND INT. CONF. ON PEER-TO-PEER COMPUTING, (20020905), pages 5 - 12, XP010612177 [A] 1-10 * Chapters "Peer Management" and "Overlay Networks" * | [A] - TAO ZHAO ET AL, "Enforcing resource sharing agreements among distributed server clusters", PARALLEL AND DISTRIBUTED PROCESSING SYMPOSIUM., PROCEEDINGS INTERNATIONAL, IPDPS 2002, ABSTRACTS AND CD-ROM FT. LAUDERDALE, FL, USA 15-19 APRIL 2002, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (20020415), ISBN 0-7695-1573-8, pages 214 - 223, XP010591037 [A] 1-10 * Chapter 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IPDPS.2002.1015497 | [A] - KING M ED - GRAHAM R L ET AL, "Breaking the server and data communications barrier with serverless guaranteed quality of service (GQoS) compliant communications", PEER-TO-PEER COMPUTING, 2001. PROCEEDINGS. FIRST INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON LINKOPING, SWEDEN 27-29 AUG. 2001, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (20010827), ISBN 0-7695-1503-7, pages 36 - 44, XP010583972 [A] 1-10 * pages 36-40 * |