EP1519395 - Interrupting chamber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/13] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bartz, Michael Böhlener Str. 63 12627 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Dienemann, Hold Büxensteinallee 26 12527 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Gericke, Joachim Schwiegersteig 9 13629 Berlin / DE | 04 /
Lehmann, Volker Neue Hufenstr. 17 A 14929 Treuenbrietzen / DE | [2005/13] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/47] | Application number, filing date | 04090342.9 | 06.09.2004 | [2005/13] | Priority number, date | DE2003145657 | 25.09.2003 Original published format: DE 10345657 | [2005/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1519395 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1519395 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | [2007/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1519395 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01H33/24 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
H01H33/24 (EP);
H01H2009/305 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI [2008/29] |
Former [2005/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schaltkammer | [2005/13] | English: | Interrupting chamber | [2005/13] | French: | Chambre de coupure | [2005/13] | Examination procedure | 05.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/25] | 08.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2579014 (TELEMECANIQUE ELECTRIQUE [FR]) [A] 1* page 3, line 1 - line 14 *; | [A]EP0513945 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE10112689 (CERAMTEC AG [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0020] * |