EP1512757 - Process for validating thermocyclers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Congen Biotechnologie GmbH Robert Rössle Str. 10 13125 Berlin / DE | [2005/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuhn, Mathias, Dr. Lychener Strasse 26 10437 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Mergemeier, Steffen, Dr. Karl-Marx-Allee 84 10243 Berlin / DE | [2005/10] | Representative(s) | Ziebig, Marlene, et al Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Wallstrasse 58/59 DE-10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | Ziebig, Marlene, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Anwaltskanzlei Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 04090345.2 | 06.09.2004 | [2005/10] | Priority number, date | DE2003141874 | 05.09.2003 Original published format: DE 10341874 | [2005/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1512757 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1512757 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | [2005/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, B01L7/00 | [2005/10] | CPC: |
C12Q1/686 (EP);
B01L7/52 (EP);
C12Q1/6881 (EP);
B01L2200/147 (EP);
B01L2300/1805 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/686, C12Q2545/113 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Validierung von Thermocyclern | [2005/10] | English: | Process for validating thermocyclers | [2005/10] | French: | Procédé pour la validation de thermocycleurs | [2005/10] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 06.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/36] | 07.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0488769 (PERKIN ELMER CETUS INSTR [US]) [X] 1* page 34, lines 17-27; claims 79,80 *; | [X] - SCHODER DAGMAR ET AL, "Physical characteristics of six new thermocyclers.", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (200306), vol. 49, no. 6, ISSN 0009-9147, pages 960 - 963, XP002313831 [X] 1-10 * page 962, column L, paragraphs 5-7 * * page 963, column L, paragraphs 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1373/49.6.960 | [X] - SAUNDERS GINNY C ET AL, "Interlaboratory study on thermal cycler performance in controlled PCR and random amplified polymorphic DNA analyses", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (200101), vol. 47, no. 1, ISSN 0009-9147, pages 47 - 55, XP002313832 [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 54, paragraph LAST - page 55, paragraph 1 * | Examination | - HE Q.; VILJANEN M.K.; MERTSOLA J., "Effects of thermocyclers and primers on the reproducibility of banding patterns in randomly amplified polymorphic DNA analysis", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR PROBES, ENGLAND, (199404), vol. 8, no. 2, pages 155 - 160 |