EP1561927 - Manifold gasget with thermal shield [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
FR
GB
Ford Global Technologies, LLC, A subsidary of Ford Motor Company 600 Parklane Towers East Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/32] | For:DE
FR
GB
Ford Global Technologies, LLC, A subsidary of Ford Motor Company 600 Parklane Towers East Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stoffels, Harald Drosselweg 57b 50735, Koeln / DE | 02 /
Krzykowski, Heinrich Westender Weg 108 5/98 58313, Herdecke / DE | [2005/32] | Representative(s) | Drömer, Hans-Carsten, et al Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung NH/DRP Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Drömer, Hans-Carsten, et al Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung NH/DRP Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2005/32] | Drömer, Hans-Carsten, Dipl.-Ing., et al Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung NH/DRP, Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 04100385.6 | 03.02.2004 | [2005/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1561927 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F02B77/11, F16J15/06, F16L59/08 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
F02B77/11 (EP);
F16J15/064 (EP);
F16J15/122 (EP);
F16L59/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Abgaskrümmerdichtung mit Hitzeschild | [2005/32] | English: | Manifold gasget with thermal shield | [2005/32] | French: | Garniture d'étancheité pour un collecteur d'échappement avec un bouclier thermique | [2005/32] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2954763 (MALCOLM ROBERT H) [X] 1-22,25 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0303068 (BURGMANN DICHTUNGSWERK FEODOR [DE]) [X] 1-22,25 * the whole document *; | [X]US5080949 (NAWROCKI DONALD A [US], et al) [X] 25-27 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4300817 (GOETZE AG [DE]) [A] 1-28 * column 3, line 22 - column 6, line 10 *; | [A]US5590524 (MOORE III DAN T [US], et al) [A] 1-28* column 3, line 26 - column 10, line 45 *; | [A]EP0857864 (PAYEN GOETZE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-28 * column 1, line 17 - column 2, line 58 *; | [A]EP0882623 (PAYEN GOETZE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-28 * column 2, lines 14-45 *; | [A]DE10049765 (J & S GMBH WERKZEUGBAU STANZ U [DE]) [A] 1-28 * column 5, line 20 - column 6, line 36 * |