EP1449775 - Method and unit for handling and processing blanks for packing tobacco articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G.D SOCIETÀ PER AZIONI Via Battindarno, 91 40133 Bologna / IT | [2008/16] |
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states G.D Societa' Per Azioni Via Battindarno, 91 40133 Bologna / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Draghetti, Fiorenzo Via San Donino 506 Frazione Villafontana 40059 Medicina / IT | 02 /
Ghini, Marco Via Verona 35 40050 Monte San Pietro / IT | [2004/35] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | Jorio, Paolo, Dr. Ing., et al Studio Torta S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 04100668.5 | 19.02.2004 | [2004/35] | Priority number, date | IT2003BO00077 | 20.02.2003 Original published format: IT BO20030077 | [2004/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1449775 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1449775 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65B43/12, B65B5/02, B65B19/22 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
B65B5/024 (EP,US);
B65B19/228 (EP,US);
B65B43/126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Behandeln und Verarbeiten von Zuschnitten für Tabakprodukte | [2007/27] | English: | Method and unit for handling and processing blanks for packing tobacco articles | [2004/35] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de manipulation et de traitement de flans pour articles de tabac | [2007/47] |
Former [2004/35] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Behandeln und Aufarbeiten von Zuschnitten für Tabakprodukte | ||
Former [2004/35] | Procédés et dispositifs de manipulation et de traitement de flans pour articles de tabac | Examination procedure | 08.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/14] | 09.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.04.2008 | BE | 16.04.2008 | CY | 16.04.2008 | CZ | 16.04.2008 | DK | 16.04.2008 | EE | 16.04.2008 | FI | 16.04.2008 | IT | 16.04.2008 | NL | 16.04.2008 | RO | 16.04.2008 | SI | 16.04.2008 | SK | 16.04.2008 | BG | 16.07.2008 | SE | 16.07.2008 | GR | 17.07.2008 | PT | 16.09.2008 | HU | 17.10.2008 | [2011/32] |
Former [2010/50] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
GR | 17.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 16.04.2008 | |
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 16.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9110595 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO CO [GB]) [A] 1,15 * page 4, line 5 - line 12; figures 1,2; claims 1,9,13,14 *; | [A]US5238355 (BOLDRINI FULVIO [IT], et al) [A] 1-29* the whole document *; | [A]US5336040 (FOCKE HEINZ [DE], et al) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [A]US5385526 (SIGRIST ALBERT [CH], et al) [A] 1,15 * the whole document *; | [A]US5630309 (BLIDUNG OTTO [DE], et al) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19635433 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [A]US5884451 (KANO KENICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [A]US6102536 (JENNEL PER [US]) [A] 1,15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1072516 (GD SPA [IT]) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [A]US2001010332 (BISMARCK GOTTFRIED VON [DE], et al) [A] 1,15 * figure 2 * |