EP1454797 - Supporting structure for housing vehicle components and/or accessories and vehicle featuring such a supporting structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIAT AUTO S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli 200 10135 Torino / IT | [2004/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cornacchia, Giorgio Corso Montecucco, 84 10100 Torino / IT | 02 /
Rempel, Roberto Rogerio Via Barbara Allason, 2 int 24 10020 Pecetto Torinese / IT | [2004/37] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/37] | Jorio, Paolo, Dr. Ing., et al Studio Torta S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 04100918.4 | 06.03.2004 | [2004/37] | Priority number, date | IT2003TO00173 | 07.03.2003 Original published format: IT TO20030173 | [2004/37] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1454797 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60R11/06 | [2004/37] | CPC: |
B60R11/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [2005/21] |
Former [2004/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Stützkonstruktion zum Aufnehmen von Fahrzeug- Komponenten und/oder Zubehörteilen und Fahrzeug mit einer solchen Stützkonstruktion. | [2004/37] | English: | Supporting structure for housing vehicle components and/or accessories and vehicle featuring such a supporting structure | [2004/37] | French: | Structure porteuse logeant des composants et/ou des accessoires de véhicule et véhicule présentant une telle structure porteuse | [2004/37] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 02.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/13] | 07.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH106863 ; | [A]DE19536511 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,13,17 * abstract * * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 4 *; | [A]DE19711387 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,13,17 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE19834134 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1,13,17* figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE19948347 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO [JP]) [A] 1,13,17 * figure -; claim - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 05, & JP10006863 A 19980113 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,13,17 * abstract * |