EP1533667 - Electronic wrist device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polar Electro Oy Professorintie 5 90440 Kempele / FI | [2005/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sääski, Jarmo Niittyrannantie 84 90450, Kempele / FI | 02 /
Mattinen, Tero Fasaanipolku 1 A 3 90450, Kempele / FI | [2005/21] | Representative(s) | Antila, Harri Jukka Tapani Kolster Oy Ab Elektroniikkatie 8 90590 Oulu / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | Antila, Harri Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, (P.O. Box 148) 00120 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 04101188.3 | 23.03.2004 | [2005/21] | Priority number, date | FI20030001690 | 20.11.2003 Original published format: FI 20031690 | [2005/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1533667 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1533667 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G04G17/02, G04B39/02 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
G04B37/085 (EP,US);
G04B19/28 (EP,US);
G04B39/025 (EP,US);
G04G17/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/21] | G04B37/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/21] | Title | German: | Elektronisches Armbandgerät | [2005/21] | English: | Electronic wrist device | [2005/21] | French: | Dispositif bracelet électronique | [2005/21] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 14.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/28] | 17.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]CH345609 (GISIGER LUSA ARMIN [CH]) [X] 1-6,8,10-13 * page 7 - page 9; figures 2-4 * [Y] 7; | [Y]JPS5754883 (SUWA SEIKOSHA KK) [Y] 7* figure 6; compound 63A *; | [XY]DE3405831 (MONDAINE WATCH LTD [CH]) [X] 1-3,6,9,12,13 * page 2, line 15 - line 46; figure 2 * [Y] 7 |