blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1465245

EP1465245 - Vapor Deposition of Benzotriazole (BTA) for protecting Copper Interconnects [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.07.2017
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.07.2017No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.08.2017  [2017/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC.
P.O. Box 655474 13500 North Central Expressway
Dallas, Texas 75265 / US
[2016/38]
Former [2004/41]For all designated states
Texas Instruments Inc.
P.O. Box 655474 13500 North Central Expressway
Dallas, Texas 75265 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Xia, Changfeng
2505 Cima Hill Drive
75025, Plano / US
02 / Sivasothy, Arunthathi
749 Player Drive
75025, Plano / US
03 / Jackson, Ricky A.
3303 Foxcreek Drive
75082, Richardson / US
04 / Haider, Asad M.
9209 Longview Drive
75025, Plano / US
 [2016/38]
Former [2004/41]01 / Xia, Changfeng
2505 Cima Hill Drive
75025, Plano / US
02 / Sivasothy, Arunthathi
749 Player Drive
75025, Plano / US
03 / Jackson, Ricky A.
3303 Foxcreek Drive
75082, Richardson / US
04 / Haider, Asad M.
9209 Longview Drive
75025, Plano / US
Representative(s)Zeller, Andreas, et al
Texas Instruments Deutschland GmbH
Haggertystraße 1
85356 Freising / DE
[2016/38]
Former [2013/18]Holt, Michael, et al
Texas Instruments Limited
3rd Floor
401 Grafton Gate
Milton Keynes
MK91AQ / GB
Former [2008/33]Holt, Michael, et al
Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department 800 Pavilion Drive
Northampton NN4 7YL / GB
Former [2004/41]Holt, Michael, et al
Texas Instruments Ltd., PO Box 5069
Northampton, Northamptonshire NN4 7ZE / GB
Application number, filing date04101319.431.03.2004
[2004/41]
Priority number, dateUS2003040559001.04.2003         Original published format: US 405590
[2004/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1465245
Date:06.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1465245
Date:25.08.2010
[2010/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1465245
Date:21.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.2010
ClassificationIPC:H01L21/768, C23C14/12
[2016/13]
CPC:
C23C14/12 (EP,US); H01L21/76838 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2004/41]H01L21/768
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2016/38]
Former [2011/18]DE,  FR,  GB 
Former [2004/41]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Dampfabscheidung von Benzotriazol (BTA) zum Schutz von Kupferinterkonnekts[2004/41]
English:Vapor Deposition of Benzotriazole (BTA) for protecting Copper Interconnects[2004/41]
French:Depôt en phase vapeur de benzotriazole pour proteger des interconnexions en cuivre[2004/41]
Examination procedure25.02.2011Examination requested  [2011/14]
26.02.2011Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
06.04.2011Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
27.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.01.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
21.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
08.08.2016Fee for grant paid
08.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.05.2011
Opposition(s)22.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/35]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
21.03.2012Request for further processing filed
21.03.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.03.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
02.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS5212636  (DAIWA KASEI KENKYUSHO) [A] 1-10* abstract *;
 [XAI]JPH02125447  (HITACHI LTD, et al) [X] 1,9 * abstract * [A] 2-8 [I] 10
by applicantJPH02125447
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.