EP1474966 - Square baler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): CY, ES, TR | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/11] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | ||
Former [2004/46] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dubois, Jean-Yves Rue du Cimetière 70100, Gresancey / FR | [2004/46] | Representative(s) | Magin, Ludwig Bernhard, et al John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/46] | Magin, Ludwig, et al Deere & Company European Office Patent Department Steubenstr.36-42 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 04101580.1 | 16.04.2004 | [2004/46] | Priority number, date | DE20031019985 | 06.05.2003 Original published format: DE 10319985 | [2004/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1474966 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1474966 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A01F15/10 | [2004/46] | CPC: |
A01F15/0825 (EP,US);
A01F15/10 (EP,US);
A01F2015/107 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/46] | Title | German: | Rechteckballenpresse | [2004/46] | English: | Square baler | [2004/46] | French: | Presse à balles carrées | [2004/46] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 05.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.11.2009
ADMISSIBLE CNH Belgium N.V. Leon Claeysstraat, 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE Opponent's representative Feldkamp, Rainer, et al, et al Garmischer Strasse 4 80339 München / DE | [2010/03] | 19.01.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.04.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.04.2010 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2010 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 30.03.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.04.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.04.2011 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 23.11.2012 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2013/01] | Appeal following opposition | 14.06.2011 | Appeal received No. T1300/11 | 23.11.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.03.2009 | CZ | 11.03.2009 | EE | 11.03.2009 | FI | 11.03.2009 | IT | 11.03.2009 | NL | 11.03.2009 | PL | 11.03.2009 | RO | 11.03.2009 | SI | 11.03.2009 | SK | 11.03.2009 | TR | 11.03.2009 | AT | 16.04.2009 | LU | 16.04.2009 | CH | 30.04.2009 | LI | 30.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | BG | 11.06.2009 | SE | 11.06.2009 | GR | 12.06.2009 | PT | 24.08.2009 | HU | 12.09.2009 | GB | 16.04.2010 | ES | 17.04.2010 | DK | 03.05.2010 | [2015/21] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IT | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
AT | 16.04.2009 | ||
LU | 16.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
HU | 12.09.2009 | ||
GB | 16.04.2010 | ||
DK | 03.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IT | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
AT | 16.04.2009 | ||
LU | 16.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
GB | 16.04.2010 | ||
DK | 03.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IT | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
AT | 16.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
GB | 16.04.2010 | ||
DK | 03.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IT | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
AT | 16.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
GB | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IT | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
AT | 16.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
AT | 16.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/38] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
AT | 16.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | FI | 11.03.2009 | |
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | FI | 11.03.2009 | |
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | NL | 11.03.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0341508 (GREENLAND GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [YD] 3 * column 2, line 37 - line 48 *; | [X]FR2742305 (CLAAS OHG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * page 1, line 1 - line 9 * * page 2, line 32 - page 3, line 8; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19841598 (LELY WELGER MASCHINENFABRIK GM [DE]) [A] 1* column 4, line 6 - line 59; figure - *; | [A]WO0156363 (VERMEER MFG CO [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 11, line 21 - page 13, line 7; figure - *; | [XDY]EP1133914 (HAY & FORAGE IND [US]) [XD] 1,2,4 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 3; | [X]US6394893 (SCHOLZ EGBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * column 1, line 55 - line 60 * * column 5, line 44 - line 47 * |