EP1477510 - Ionic complexes and process to prepare these complexes as well as method for controlled release of active agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leibniz-Institut für Polymerforschung Dresden e.V. Hohe Strasse 6 01069 Dresden / DE | [2005/13] |
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states Institut für Polymerforschung Dresden e.V. Hohe Strasse 6 01069 Dresden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Böhme, Frank, Dr. Am Burgwartsblick 22 01705, Freital / DE | 02 /
Sharavanan, Karthikeyan 490, Fourth Street 641038, K.K. Pudur, Coimbatore / IN | 03 /
Voit, Brigitte Nürnberger Str. 32 01187, Dresden / DE | [2004/47] | Representative(s) | Rauschenbach, Marion Rauschenbach Patentanwälte Postfach 27 01 75 01172 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | Rauschenbach, Marion, Dipl.-Ing. Rauschenbach Patentanwälte Postfach 27 01 75 01172 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 04101654.4 | 21.04.2004 | [2004/47] | Priority number, date | DE2003121165 | 06.05.2003 Original published format: DE 10321165 | [2004/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1477510 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1477510 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/00, A61K47/48 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
C08G73/00 (EP);
C08G73/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/47] | Title | German: | Ionische Komplexe und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung sowie Verfahren zur kontrollierten Abgabe von Wirkstoffen | [2004/47] | English: | Ionic complexes and process to prepare these complexes as well as method for controlled release of active agents | [2004/47] | French: | Complexes ioniques et procédé pour leur fabrication et méthode de libération controlée d'agents actifs | [2004/47] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 31.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/18] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2310789 (MADISON HUNT, et al) [A] 1-11* claim 3 *; | [DX] - K. SHARAVANAN ET AL, "Synthesis and Properties of Aliphatic Polyacetamidines", MACROMOL. CHEM. PHYS., WEINHEIM, (2002), vol. 203, pages 1852 - 1858, XP002298173 [DX] 1-11 * page 1854, column LEFT, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 1854, column RIGHT, paragraph 1 * * page 1855, column LEFT, paragraph 2 * * page 1855, column LEFT, paragraph 6 * * page 1855; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1521-3935(200208)203:12<1852::AID-MACP1852>3.0.CO;2-5 | [X] - TENKOVTSEV ET AL, "Ionic Complexes of Bis(hydroxyarylidene)alkanones with Strong Polymeric Bases as a New Class of Third-Order Nonlinear Optical Chromophores", MACROMOLECULES, (2001), vol. 34, pages 7100 - 7107, XP002298174 [X] 1-11 * page 7101; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma0020234 |