EP1473670 - Colour edge enhancement method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan 3-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon 442-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan 3-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon 442-742, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lin, Peng 232 Duranzo Aisle Irvine, California 92606 / US | 02 /
Kim, Yeong-taeg 604 Sonoma Aisle Irvine, California 92618 / US | [2004/45] | Representative(s) | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/45] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 04101795.5 | 28.04.2004 | [2004/45] | Priority number, date | US20030449189 | 28.04.2003 Original published format: US 449189 | [2004/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1473670 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1473670 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00, H04N7/26, H04N7/50, G06T5/50 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
H04N9/646 (EP,US);
H02K41/031 (KR);
G06T5/50 (EP,US);
G06T5/73 (EP,US);
H04N19/117 (EP,US);
H04N19/182 (EP,US);
H04N19/186 (EP,US);
H04N19/80 (EP,US);
G03B3/10 (KR);
G06T2207/10016 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10024 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20012 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/45] | G06T5/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/50] |
Former [2004/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Farbkantenverstärkung | [2004/45] | English: | Colour edge enhancement method | [2004/45] | French: | Méthode pour l'accentuation des bords en couleurs | [2004/45] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/46] | 08.10.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/35] | 14.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US3778543 (LOWRY J) [I] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0457931 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-38 * abstract ** page 5, column l *; | [XI]EP0802686 (QUANTEL LTD [GB]) [X] 1-2,4-9,11 * figures 3,4,10,11 * * column 2, line 16 - line 40 * * column 3, line 50 - line 58 * * column 4, line 44 - line 50 * * column 6, line 25 - line 30 * [I] 3,10,12-17,19-30,32-38 |