EP1473325 - High strength material based on vinylester and/or epoxyde resin, preparation process, composite material and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASTRIUM SAS 6, rue Laurent Pichat 75016 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | For all designated states ASTRIUM SAS 6 rue Laurent Pichat 75016 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states EADS SPACE Transportation SA 37, Boulevard de Montmorency 75116 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chauray, Estelle 03, rue du Colonel Picot 33600, Pessac / FR | 02 /
Defoort, Brigitte 04, rue César Franck 33160, Saint Medard en Jalles / FR | 03 /
Boursereau, Frédéric 09, avenue du Commandant d'Aussy 33110, le Bouscat / FR | 04 /
Soum, Alain 07, allée Paul Gauguin 33170, Gradignan / FR | [2004/45] | Representative(s) | Poulin, Gérard BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Poulin, Gérard Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/45] | Poulin, Gérard BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04101865.6 | 30.04.2004 | [2004/45] | Priority number, date | FR20030050138 | 02.05.2003 Original published format: FR 0350138 | [2004/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1473325 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1473325 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08L81/06, C08L63/00 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
C08L55/005 (EP,US);
C08L63/10 (EP,US);
C08L71/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24994 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31511 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31938 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L55/005, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L63/10, C08L2666/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2005/29] |
Former [2004/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hochfestes Material basierend auf Vinylester und/oder Epoxydharz, Herstellungsverfahren, Verbundmaterial und Verwendung | [2004/45] | English: | High strength material based on vinylester and/or epoxyde resin, preparation process, composite material and use | [2004/45] | French: | Matériau à haute tenacité à base d'une résine vinylester et/ou d'une résine epoxyde, son procédé de fabrication, matériau composite le comprenant et ses utilisations | [2004/45] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 27.07.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.08.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.06.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5434226 (NGUYEN LY D [US], et al) [X] 1,13-15,21,22 * example 4 * * column 3, lines 6-66 * * column 6, lines 18,19 * * column 10, line 37 *; | [XY]WO9743339 (CRC FOR POLYMERS PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1,13-15,21,22 * example 25 * * page 4, lines 21-24 * * page 6, lines 4-8 * * page 7, lines 9-12 * [Y] 13,20,21; | [XAY] - S WANG, J WANG, Q JI, A R SHULTZ, T C WARD, J E MCGRATH, "Miscibility and Morphologies of Poly(Arylene ether phenyl phosphine oxide/sulfone) Copolymer/Vinyl Ester Resin Mixtures and Their Cured Networks", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE: PART B: POLYMER PHYSICS, (2000), vol. 38, pages 2409 - 2421, XP002266573 [X] 1-7,9-15 * page 2418 - page 2419; figure 2; table III * * table III * * the whole document * [A] 8,16-19,23 [Y] 13,20,21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1099-0488(20000915)38:18<2409::AID-POLB80>3.0.CO;2-G |