EP1496153 - Suction or blowing device with sealing arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states Voith Paper Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schrefl, Herbert Klostergasse 7 3100 St. Pölten / AT | 02 /
Graf-Müller, Harald St. Margarethen Nr. 134 8321 St. Margarethen/Raab / AT | 03 /
Klarer, Christoph Am Neubau 6/2/2 3071 Böheimkirchen / AT | 04 /
Kerschbaumer, Josef Kuffarn 9 3643 Maria Laach / AT | 05 /
Gutlederer, Erwin Dorfnerstrasse 37/1/11 3390 Melk / AT | 06 /
Wulz, Klaus Wächterstrasse 8 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2005/02] | Representative(s) | Kunze, Klaus, et al Voith Paper Holding GmbH & Co. KG Abteilung zjp Sankt Poeltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | Kunze, Klaus, et al Voith Paper Holding GmbH & Co. KG Abteilung zjp Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 04102225.2 | 19.05.2004 | [2005/02] | Priority number, date | DE2003131399 | 11.07.2003 Original published format: DE 10331399 | [2005/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1496153 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | D21F3/10 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
D21F3/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/02] | Title | German: | Saug- oder Blasvorrichtung mit Dichtungseinrichtung | [2005/02] | English: | Suction or blowing device with sealing arrangement | [2005/02] | French: | Arrangement d'aspiration ou de soufflage avec dispositif d'étanchéité | [2005/02] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 02.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/27] | 15.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19751283 (VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECH PATENT [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-9 * column 9, lines 37-46 * * column 11, lines 25-35 * * figures 10,14 *; | [X]EP0987364 (VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECH PATENT [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0016] - [0019] - [0028] **Abbildung*; | [PX]EP1348806 (VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-7,9 * paragraphs [0018] - [0031] * * figure - * |