EP1491465 - Intermediate storing apparatus for handling roll goods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Done Logistics Oy Hakasivuntie 1 61800 Kauhajoki / FI | [2005/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nurmela, Juhani Done Logistics Oy Palomäentie 8 61720, Koskue / FI | 02 /
Knuuttila, Jorma Done Logistics Oy Mustikkatie 6 60720, Tuomikylä / FI | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Kangasmäki, Reijo Holger, et al Finnish Patent Consulting FPC Patenttikonsultointi Kangasmäki Oy Enqvistinkatu 7A 33400 Tampere / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Kangasmäki, Reijo Holger, et al Finnish Patent Consulting FPC, Hermiankatu 14 33720 Tampere / FI | Application number, filing date | 04102312.8 | 26.05.2004 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | FI20030000939 | 24.06.2003 Original published format: FI 20030939 | [2005/01] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1491465 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1491465 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/04, B65H19/12 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
B65H23/08 (EP);
B65G1/04 (EP);
B65G2201/0232 (EP);
B65H2301/41374 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Zwischenlagern von rollenförmigen Gegenständen | [2005/01] | English: | Intermediate storing apparatus for handling roll goods | [2005/01] | French: | Dispositif de stockage intermédiaire d'articles de type rouleau | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 08.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.03.2006 | BE | 29.03.2006 | CH | 29.03.2006 | CY | 29.03.2006 | CZ | 29.03.2006 | EE | 29.03.2006 | FI | 29.03.2006 | FR | 29.03.2006 | IT | 29.03.2006 | LI | 29.03.2006 | NL | 29.03.2006 | PL | 29.03.2006 | RO | 29.03.2006 | SI | 29.03.2006 | SK | 29.03.2006 | TR | 29.03.2006 | IE | 26.05.2006 | LU | 26.05.2006 | MC | 31.05.2006 | BG | 29.06.2006 | DK | 29.06.2006 | SE | 29.06.2006 | DE | 30.06.2006 | GR | 30.06.2006 | ES | 10.07.2006 | PT | 29.08.2006 | HU | 30.09.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/52] | AT | 29.03.2006 | |
BE | 29.03.2006 | ||
CH | 29.03.2006 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2006 | ||
EE | 29.03.2006 | ||
FI | 29.03.2006 | ||
FR | 29.03.2006 | ||
IT | 29.03.2006 | ||
LI | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
PL | 29.03.2006 | ||
RO | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
TR | 29.03.2006 | ||
IE | 26.05.2006 | ||
LU | 26.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
DE | 30.06.2006 | ||
GR | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
HU | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 29.03.2006 | |
BE | 29.03.2006 | ||
CH | 29.03.2006 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2006 | ||
EE | 29.03.2006 | ||
FI | 29.03.2006 | ||
IT | 29.03.2006 | ||
LI | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
PL | 29.03.2006 | ||
RO | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
TR | 29.03.2006 | ||
IE | 26.05.2006 | ||
LU | 26.05.2006 | ||
FR | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
DE | 30.06.2006 | ||
GR | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
HU | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | AT | 29.03.2006 | |
BE | 29.03.2006 | ||
CH | 29.03.2006 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2006 | ||
EE | 29.03.2006 | ||
FI | 29.03.2006 | ||
IT | 29.03.2006 | ||
LI | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
PL | 29.03.2006 | ||
RO | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
TR | 29.03.2006 | ||
IE | 26.05.2006 | ||
LU | 26.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
DE | 30.06.2006 | ||
GR | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
HU | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 29.03.2006 | |
BE | 29.03.2006 | ||
CH | 29.03.2006 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2006 | ||
EE | 29.03.2006 | ||
FI | 29.03.2006 | ||
IT | 29.03.2006 | ||
LI | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
PL | 29.03.2006 | ||
RO | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
IE | 26.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
DE | 30.06.2006 | ||
GR | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
HU | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 29.03.2006 | |
BE | 29.03.2006 | ||
CH | 29.03.2006 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2006 | ||
EE | 29.03.2006 | ||
FI | 29.03.2006 | ||
IT | 29.03.2006 | ||
LI | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
PL | 29.03.2006 | ||
RO | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
IE | 26.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
DE | 30.06.2006 | ||
GR | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 29.03.2006 | |
BE | 29.03.2006 | ||
CH | 29.03.2006 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2006 | ||
IT | 29.03.2006 | ||
LI | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
PL | 29.03.2006 | ||
RO | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
IE | 26.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
DE | 30.06.2006 | ||
GR | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 29.03.2006 | |
BE | 29.03.2006 | ||
CH | 29.03.2006 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2006 | ||
IT | 29.03.2006 | ||
LI | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
PL | 29.03.2006 | ||
RO | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
IE | 26.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
DE | 30.06.2006 | ||
GR | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/43] | AT | 29.03.2006 | |
BE | 29.03.2006 | ||
CH | 29.03.2006 | ||
IT | 29.03.2006 | ||
LI | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
PL | 29.03.2006 | ||
RO | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
IE | 26.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
DE | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 29.03.2006 | |
BE | 29.03.2006 | ||
CH | 29.03.2006 | ||
LI | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
PL | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
IE | 26.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | AT | 29.03.2006 | |
BE | 29.03.2006 | ||
CH | 29.03.2006 | ||
LI | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
PL | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | AT | 29.03.2006 | |
BE | 29.03.2006 | ||
CH | 29.03.2006 | ||
LI | 29.03.2006 | ||
PL | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 29.03.2006 | |
CH | 29.03.2006 | ||
LI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 29.03.2006 | |
CH | 29.03.2006 | ||
LI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | AT | 29.03.2006 | |
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 29.03.2006 | |
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 29.03.2006 | |
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 29.03.2006 | |
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | SI | 29.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP1022706 ; | [A]US5085377 (ROHRER JEAN [CH], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 7; figure 1 * * column 5, line 30 - line 49; figure 4 *; | [A]WO0183334 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE], et al) [A] * page 11, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; compounds 3,4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890512), vol. 0132, no. 02, Database accession no. (M - 824), & JP1022706 A 19890125 (KANEDA KIKAI SEISAKUSHO:KK) [A] * abstract * |