EP1494444 - Method and module for sending information about reachable terminals belonging to a called party to a calling party [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unify GmbH & Co. KG Hofmannstrasse 51 81379 München / DE | [2013/49] |
Former [2011/19] | For all designated states Siemens Enterprise Communications GmbH & Co. KG Hofmannstrasse 51 81379 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lederer, Thomas Ludwig-Braille-Str. 10 81379, München / DE | [2014/32] |
Former [2005/01] | 01 /
Lederer, Thomas Ludwig-Braille-Str. 10 81379, München / DE | Representative(s) | Fritzsche, Thomas, et al Fritzsche Patent Naupliastraße 110 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | Fritzsche, Thomas, et al Fritzsche Patent Naupliastrasse 110 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04102556.0 | 07.06.2004 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | DE2003130281 | 04.07.2003 Original published format: DE 10330281 | [2005/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1494444 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1494444 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/42 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
H04M3/42 (EP,US);
H04M3/42093 (EP,US);
H04M3/42365 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2005/38] |
Former [2005/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Modul zum Senden von Informationen bezüglich erreichbarer Endgeräte eines angerufenen Teilnehmers an den anrufenden Teilnehmer | [2005/01] | English: | Method and module for sending information about reachable terminals belonging to a called party to a calling party | [2005/01] | French: | Procédé et système pour envoyer des informations vers un appelant sur les terminaux accessibles d'un appelé | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/14] | 02.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2005 | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 06.08.2014 | [2015/09] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE10147770 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-20 * abstract ** paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0015]; figure 2 *; | [X]EP1313330 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0021]; figures 1,2 * |