EP1486848 - Joystick control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CNH U.K. LIMITED Cranes Farm Road Basildon, Essex S14 3AD / GB | [2010/47] |
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states CNH U.K. LIMITED Cranes Farm Road Basildon, Essex SS14 3AD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mowatt, Jeffrey William 5 Juniper Close Billericay, Essex CM11 1BY / GB | 02 /
Hipsey, Martin Jon 8 Ramblersway Burnham-on-Crouch, Essex CMO 8LR / GB | 03 /
Colliar, James 29 Radford Way Billericay, Essex CM12 OAA / GB | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | CNH Industrial IP Department CNH Belgium NV Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | CNH IP Department c/o CNH Belgium NV, Patent Department, Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 04102685.7 | 14.06.2004 | [2004/51] | Priority number, date | GB20030013856 | 14.06.2003 Original published format: GB 0313856 | [2004/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1486848 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1486848 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G05G1/58, G05G9/047, G05G1/62, A01B63/00, E02F9/20 | [2010/29] | CPC: |
G05G1/58 (EP,US);
A01B63/00 (EP,US);
E02F9/2004 (EP,US);
G05G1/62 (EP,US);
G05G9/047 (EP,US);
H01H25/04 (EP,US);
H01H9/286 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/51] | G05G1/26, G05G9/047, E02F9/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/51] | Title | German: | Steuerknüppel | [2004/51] | English: | Joystick control | [2004/51] | French: | Levier de commande | [2004/51] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/30] | 06.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.11.2010 | BE | 24.11.2010 | CY | 24.11.2010 | CZ | 24.11.2010 | DK | 24.11.2010 | EE | 24.11.2010 | FI | 24.11.2010 | HU | 24.11.2010 | NL | 24.11.2010 | PL | 24.11.2010 | RO | 24.11.2010 | SE | 24.11.2010 | SI | 24.11.2010 | SK | 24.11.2010 | TR | 24.11.2010 | BG | 24.02.2011 | GR | 25.02.2011 | ES | 07.03.2011 | PT | 24.03.2011 | IE | 14.06.2011 | LU | 14.06.2011 | CH | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
TR | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
IE | 14.06.2011 | ||
LU | 14.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
IE | 14.06.2011 | ||
LU | 14.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
IE | 14.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
IE | 14.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4526055 (BATCHELOR FREDERICK H [GB], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 32; figure 1 * * column A * [Y] 5; | [X]EP0444260 (GFK AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 7, line 1 - line 8; figure 2 * * column 8, line 14 - line 22 *; | [A]US5630756 (THURSTON KEITH E [CA], et al) [A] 1* column A; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0965901 (FORD NEW HOLLAND NV [BE]) [Y] 5 * abstract * |