EP1488941 - Airtight coaxial hub to regulate the internal pressure of tyres even when the vehicle is riding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | ||
Former [2004/52] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tarasinski, Nicolai Gotthilf-Salzmann-Str. 60 67227, Frankenthal / DE | 02 /
Kneer, Bernd Heidelbergerstr. 30 68519, Viernheim / DE | 03 /
Jungmann, Hans-Christian Kreisstr. 45 69469, Weinheim / DE | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Holst, Sönke, et al John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/52] | Holst, Sönke, Dr., et al Deere & Company, European Office, Patent Department Steubenstrasse 36-42 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 04102810.1 | 18.06.2004 | [2004/52] | Priority number, date | DE2003127650 | 20.06.2003 Original published format: DE 10327650 | [2004/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1488941 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1488941 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | [2008/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1488941 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60C23/00 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
B60C23/00336 (EP,US);
B60C23/00345 (EP,US);
B60C23/00363 (EP,US);
Y10T137/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/52] | Title | German: | Luftdichte, koaxiale Radnabe zum Regulieren des internen Reifendrucks während der Fahrt | [2004/52] | English: | Airtight coaxial hub to regulate the internal pressure of tyres even when the vehicle is riding | [2004/52] | French: | Moyeu coaxial étanche a l'air pour la régulation de la pression interne des pneus, même lorsque le véhicule est en marche | [2004/52] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 30.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.06.2009 | CZ | 03.06.2009 | DK | 03.06.2009 | EE | 03.06.2009 | IE | 03.06.2009 | NL | 03.06.2009 | PL | 03.06.2009 | RO | 03.06.2009 | SI | 03.06.2009 | SK | 03.06.2009 | TR | 03.06.2009 | LU | 18.06.2009 | BE | 30.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | BG | 03.09.2009 | SE | 03.09.2009 | GR | 04.09.2009 | ES | 14.09.2009 | PT | 03.10.2009 | HU | 04.12.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 03.06.2009 | |
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
LU | 18.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
HU | 04.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 03.06.2009 | |
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
LU | 18.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | CZ | 03.06.2009 | |
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | CZ | 03.06.2009 | |
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CZ | 03.06.2009 | |
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | CZ | 03.06.2009 | |
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 03.09.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | CZ | 03.06.2009 | |
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SK | 03.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | CZ | 03.06.2009 | |
EE | 03.06.2009 | ||
IE | 03.06.2009 | ||
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
RO | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
ES | 14.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | IE | 03.06.2009 | |
NL | 03.06.2009 | ||
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | NL | 03.06.2009 | |
PL | 03.06.2009 | ||
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | NL | 03.06.2009 | |
SI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | NL | 03.06.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4431043 (GOODELL FRED L [US], et al) [A] 1-19* figure -; claim -- *; | [AD]DE19950191 (TIGGES & WINCKEL BONUMWERKE [DE]) [AD] 1-19 * the whole document * |