EP1503046 - Device for separating foreign particles out of the cooling air that can be fed to the rotor blades of a turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/05] | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fried, Reinhard Stockackerstrasse 3A 5415 Nussbaumen / CH | 02 /
Weigand, Bernhard, Prof., Dr. Heuss-Strasse 28/1 70794 Filderstadt-Sielmingen / DE | [2005/05] | Application number, filing date | 04103026.3 | 29.06.2004 | [2005/05] | Priority number, date | DE2003130471 | 05.07.2003 Original published format: DE 10330471 | [2005/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1503046 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1503046 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/32, F01D5/08 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
F01D5/082 (EP,US);
F01D11/001 (EP,US);
F05D2260/607 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/05] | F01D25/32 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2013/11] |
Former [2005/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Abscheiden von Fremdpartikeln aus der den Laufschaufeln einer Turbine zuführbaren Kühlluft | [2005/05] | English: | Device for separating foreign particles out of the cooling air that can be fed to the rotor blades of a turbine | [2005/05] | French: | Dispositif de séparation de particules étrangères contenues dans des fluides de refroidissement d'aubes mobiles d'une turbine | [2005/05] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/32] | 21.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5222693 (SLUTZKIN SAMUEL [IL], et al) [A] 1-23 * column 3, line 20 - column 5, line 36 ** figure 3 *; | [XDAI]EP0690202 (MTU MUENCHEN GMBH [DE]) [XD] 1-10,23 * the whole document * [A] 11-16,18-22 [I] 17; | [XDI]EP1174589 (ALSTOM SWITZERLAND LTD [CH]) [XD] 1,2,11 * paragraphs [0019] - [0024] * * figures 1,2 * [I] 17-23 |