|
27.03.2015 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
25 |
|
28.01.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2015 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
20.01.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.11.2014 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
25.11.2014 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
11.11.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.09.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.09.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.09.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2014 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2014 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.04.2014 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.04.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.04.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.04.2014 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.04.2014 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.04.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2012 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
02.02.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2012 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.01.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.01.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
06.01.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
06.01.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.01.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
01.12.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.11.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.11.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.10.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Annex |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.04.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
30.03.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.03.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.03.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.08.2008 |
Fax filed during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.08.2008 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
13.08.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2007 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2007 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.09.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.09.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2007 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2007 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.05.2007 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.05.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.01.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.12.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.2004 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.12.2004 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2004 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2004 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |