05.04.2015 |
Revocation of patent |
published on 06.05.2015 [2015/19] |
28.03.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked |
|
28.01.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
24.01.2015 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
26.09.2014 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
25.04.2014 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
02.04.2014 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
02.04.2014 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
10.01.2012 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal |
|
29.11.2011 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
10.11.2011 |
New entry: Appeal number |
|
10.11.2011 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
07.09.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision |
|
07.09.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
18.11.2010 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
12.06.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] |
03.04.2009 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
06.02.2009 |
Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
16.09.2008 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
15.08.2008 |
Opposition filed |
published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
12.10.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] |
09.10.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.10.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.07.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.05.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.08.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.07.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.05.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.01.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.09.2005 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 26.10.2005 [2005/43] |
19.08.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.10.2005 [2005/40] |
24.12.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] |