Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6972307 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2005 | B2 | US2005027054 | 03.02.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US63104503 | 29.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1505115 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2007 | B1 | EP1505115 | 09.02.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US63104503 | 29.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004010008T | 18.09.2008 | T2 | DE602004010008D1 | 27.12.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US63104503 | 29.07.2003 |