EP1492107 - Recordable storage medium with protected data area [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/01] | RECORDABLE STORAGE MEDIUM WITH PROTECTED DATA AREA | ||
[2013/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2014/11] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINNARTZ, Johan, P., M., G. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards c/o P.O. Box 220 5600 AE, Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
KALKER, Antonius, A., C., M. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards c/o P.O. P.O Box 220 5600 AE, Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
TALSTRA, Johan, C. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards c/o P.O. Box 220 5600 AE, Eindhoven / NL | [2013/46] |
Former [2005/01] | 01 /
LINNARTZ, Johan, P., M., G. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards c/o P.O. 5600 AE, Eindhoven / NL | ||
02 /
KALKER, Antonius, A., C., M. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards c/o P.O. 5600 AE, Eindhoven / NL | |||
03 /
TALSTRA, Johan, C. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards c/o P.O. 5600 AE, Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2005/01] | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 04103756.5 | 08.05.2001 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | EP20000201951 | 02.06.2000 Original published format: EP 00201951 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1492107 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1492107 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1492107 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/00, G06F21/00 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
G06F21/64 (EP,US);
G11B20/00268 (EP,KR,US);
G06F21/80 (EP,US);
G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
G11B20/00094 (EP,US);
G11B20/00123 (EP,US);
G11B20/00188 (EP,US);
G11B20/0021 (EP,US);
G11B20/00326 (EP,US);
G11B20/00384 (EP,KR,US);
G11B20/00405 (EP,US);
G11B20/00557 (EP,US);
G11B20/00898 (KR);
G11B20/1217 (KR);
G11B2020/1229 (KR);
G11B2020/1259 (EP,US);
G11B2220/216 (KR);
G11B2220/2545 (KR);
G11B2220/2562 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/01] | G11B20/00, G11B20/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/01] | Title | German: | Beschreibbares Speichermedium mit geschütztem Datenbereich | [2005/01] | English: | Recordable storage medium with protected data area | [2013/36] | French: | Support de stockage enregistrable avec zone de données protegée | [2005/01] |
Former [2005/01] | RECORDABLE STORAGE MEDIUM WITH PROTECTED DATA AREA | Examination procedure | 18.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 09.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01938199.5 / EP1292946 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010938199) is 11.08.2003 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.03.2014 | BE | 12.03.2014 | CY | 12.03.2014 | DK | 12.03.2014 | ES | 12.03.2014 | FI | 12.03.2014 | IT | 12.03.2014 | MC | 12.03.2014 | NL | 12.03.2014 | SE | 12.03.2014 | IE | 08.05.2014 | LU | 08.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | GR | 13.06.2014 | PT | 14.07.2014 | [2016/28] |
Former [2015/21] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 08.05.2014 | ||
LU | 08.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
LU | 08.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
LU | 08.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
LU | 08.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
LU | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0871141 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1,9,10,14,18-22 * abstract * * column 1, lines 3-45 * * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 11 * * column 4, lines 29-39 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US6028936 (HILLIS W DANIEL [US]) [A] 1,9,10,14,18-22 * abstract * * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 34 * * column 4, line 14 - column 5, line 13 * * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0984346 (HITACHI EUROP LTD [GB]) [A] 1,9,10,14,18-22 * abstract * * column 4, line 22 - column 7, line 47 * * column 9, line 42 - column 10, line 11 * * figures 1-9 *; | [AP]JP2000286839 (RICOH KK) [AP] 1,9,10,14,18-22* abstract * |