EP1519628 - Method and device for the reproduction of a binaural output signal which is derived from a monaural input signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/13] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lucioni, Gonzalo Wemer Strasse 21a 58454 Witten / DE | [2005/13] | Representative(s) | Fritzsche, Thomas, et al Fritzsche Patent Naupliastraße 110 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | Fritzsche, Thomas, et al Fritzsche Patent Naupliastrasse 110 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04103766.4 | 05.08.2004 | [2005/13] | Priority number, date | DE2003145167 | 29.09.2003 Original published format: DE 10345167 | [2005/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1519628 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1519628 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04S5/00 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
H04S5/00 (EP,US);
H04S2420/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2009/46] |
Former [2005/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Wiedergabe eines aus einem monauralen Eingangssignal erzeugten binauralen Ausgangssignals | [2005/13] | English: | Method and device for the reproduction of a binaural output signal which is derived from a monaural input signal | [2005/13] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la restitution d'un signal de sortie de mode stéréo qui est obtenu d'un signal d'entrée de mode mono | [2005/13] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/43] | 05.09.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 04.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/30] | 12.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5235646 (WILDE MARTIN D [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * column 4, line 45 - column 10, line 8 *; | [X]WO0225999 (CENTRAL RESEARCH LAB LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,8 * page 1, line 5 - page 2, line 19 ** page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 14 *; | [X]US6408327 (MCCLENNON R SCOTT [CA], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 47 * * column 3, line 17 - column 9, line 24 *; | [X]US2003035553 (BAUMGARTE FRANK [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0089] * |