Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6966351 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2005 | B2 | US2005061414 | 24.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66753603 | 22.09.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4723837B | Global Dossier | 13.07.2011 | B2 | JP2005096755 | 14.04.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US66753603 | 22.09.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1516752 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2008 | B1 | EP1516752 | 23.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66753603 | 22.09.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0403969 | 24.05.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US66753603 | 22.09.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004014568D1 | 07.08.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US66753603 | 22.09.2003 |