EP1516752 - Tire bead configuration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 1144 East Market Street Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/26] | For all designated states THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1144 East Market Street Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US | ||
Former [2005/12] | For all designated states THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1144 East Market Street Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scarpitti, Anthony John 2551 Spyglass Way Uniontown, OH 44685 / US | [2005/12] | Representative(s) | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | Application number, filing date | 04104545.1 | 20.09.2004 | [2005/12] | Priority number, date | US20030667536 | 22.09.2003 Original published format: US 667536 | [2005/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1516752 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1516752 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60C15/00 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
B60C15/0018 (EP,US);
B60C9/023 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10819 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/50] |
Former [2005/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Reifenwulst-Aufbau | [2005/12] | English: | Tire bead configuration | [2005/12] | French: | Configuration de talon de pneumatique | [2005/12] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 29.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]JP2004098826 ; | [X]GB320535 (INDIA RUBBER GUTTA PERCHA TELE, et al) [X] 1* the whole document *; | [X]GB393312 (INDIA RUBBER GUTTA PERCHA TELE, et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0230690 (MICHELIN SOC TECH [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8,10 * figures 5,6 *; | [X]US2002124935 (CARETTA RENATO [IT]) [X] 1-5 * figures 12-16 * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2004098826 A 20040402 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [PX] 1-6,8-10 * abstract * |