EP1529803 - Rubber coating composition for metallic reinforcements and tires using the rubber coating composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Aktiengesellschaft Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2005/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weber, Christian Dr. Hannoversche Strasse 138b 30823 Garbsen / DE | [2005/19] | Application number, filing date | 04104648.3 | 24.09.2004 | [2005/19] | Priority number, date | DE2003152045 | 07.11.2003 Original published format: DE 10352045 | [2005/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1529803 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1529803 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/36, C08K3/04, C08K5/098, C08J5/10, C08L21/00 | [2005/19] | CPC: |
C08K3/36 (EP);
C08K3/04 (EP);
C08K5/098 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/04, C08L21/00 (EP);
C08K3/36, C08L21/00 (EP);
C08K5/098, C08L21/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/19] | Extension states | AL | 11.11.2005 | LT | 11.11.2005 | LV | 11.11.2005 | MK | 11.11.2005 | Title | German: | Gummierungsmischung für metallische Festigkeitsträger und Fahrzeugluftreifen mit einer solchen Gummierungsmischung | [2005/19] | English: | Rubber coating composition for metallic reinforcements and tires using the rubber coating composition | [2005/19] | French: | Composition de gommage pour renforcements métalliques et pneu pour véhicule comportant cette composition de gommage | [2005/19] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 17.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.11.2007 | CZ | 07.11.2007 | DK | 07.11.2007 | EE | 07.11.2007 | FI | 07.11.2007 | GB | 07.11.2007 | IE | 07.11.2007 | NL | 07.11.2007 | PL | 07.11.2007 | RO | 07.11.2007 | SI | 07.11.2007 | SK | 07.11.2007 | TR | 07.11.2007 | BG | 07.02.2008 | SE | 07.02.2008 | GR | 08.02.2008 | ES | 18.02.2008 | PT | 07.04.2008 | HU | 08.05.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/34] | CY | 07.11.2007 | |
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
GB | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
HU | 08.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 07.11.2007 | |
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
GB | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
GB | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
GB | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/03] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
GB | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | NL | 07.11.2007 | |
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | NL | 07.11.2007 | |
PL | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1122528 (PIRELLI) [A] 1-6 * page 4, line 1 - line 25 * * page 1, line 13 - line 24 * * page 2, line 15 - line 50 *; | [X]DE10049964 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-6 * page 3, line 14 - page 4, line 19; claim - * * page 2, line 59 *; | [DA]EP1260384 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [DA] 1-6* abstract *; | [A] - J. SCHNETGER, Lexikon der Kautschuk-Technik, HEIDELBERG, HÜTHIG BUCH VERLAG, (1991), XP002313265 [A] 1-5 * Kieselsäure-Füllstoffe *; page 331 - page 332 * |