EP1570910 - Pump sprayer having an anti-clog discharge spout and a lockable plunger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Calmar Inc. 333 South Turnbull Canyon Road City of Industry, CA 91745-1203 / US | [2005/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Costa, Lluis 15228 E. Shadybend Drive Unit No. 16 91745, Hacienda Heights, CA / US | 02 /
Pietrowski, Daria 18685 Ambrose Lane 92648, Huntington Beach, CA / US | [2005/36] | Representative(s) | Sommer, Peter PRIO Patentanwälte Augustaanlage 22 68165 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | Sommer, Peter Sommer Patentanwalt und European Patent and Trademark Attorney Viktoriastrasse 28 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 04104806.7 | 30.09.2004 | [2005/36] | Priority number, date | US20040780704 | 19.02.2004 Original published format: US 780704 | [2005/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1570910 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B05B11/00 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
B05B11/0027 (EP,US);
F04B9/14 (KR);
B05B11/1059 (EP,US);
B05B15/50 (EP,US);
F04B33/00 (KR);
B05B15/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/36] | Title | German: | Pumpzerstäuber mit verstopfungsfreier Düsenöffnung und verriegelbarem Kolben | [2005/36] | English: | Pump sprayer having an anti-clog discharge spout and a lockable plunger | [2005/36] | French: | Pulvérisateur à pompe avec moyens pour empêcher l'obstruction de l'orifice de buse et piston verrouillable | [2005/36] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 14.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/33] | 31.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE20000860U (SEAQUIST PERFECT DISPENSING [DE]) [A] 1* page 12, line 18 - page 14, line 7; figures 14,15 *; | [X]EP1024094 (VALOIS SA [FR]) [X] 1-4,10,12 * paragraphs [0015] - [0031]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO0212090 (AIKEN IND INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 8, line 28 - page 10, line 2; figures 2,3 * |