EP1647927 - New product demand forecasting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAP AG Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | [2006/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Li, Sheng 962 Celia Drive Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 02 /
Schierholt, Hans Karsten 4446 Avenue, Beaconsfield Montreal, Quebec H4A 2H6 / CA | 03 /
Dudat, Olaf S. Gaisbergstr. 42 69115 Heidelberg / DE | 04 /
Heimburger, Ralf Max-Planck-Str. 2 68789 St. Leon-Rot / DE | 05 /
Kamp, Carole Ann 15541 Schmidgall Road Tremont, IL 81588 / US | 06 /
Kley, Thomas Jon Van 833 Fairway Park Drive Ann Arbor, MI 48103 / US | 07 /
Vasi, Gary L. 3084 Frankton Troy, MI 48083 / US | 08 /
Schmitz, Hans Schäferei 38 53881 Euskirchen / DE | [2006/16] | Representative(s) | Schramm, Michael, et al Bettinger Schneider Schramm Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 02 67 81629 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/16] | Schramm, Michael, et al Bettinger Schneider Schramm, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 86 02 67 81629 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04105097.2 | 15.10.2004 | [2006/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1647927 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2006/16] | CPC: |
G06Q10/04 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0201 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0202 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/16] | Title | German: | Vorhersage der Nachfrage nach neuen Produkten | [2006/16] | English: | New product demand forecasting | [2006/16] | French: | Prévision de la demande de nouveaux produits | [2006/16] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 20.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.09.2008 | 17.09.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/07] | 23.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.10.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5712985 (LEE MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 1-32 * abstract * * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 64 * * column 4, line 40 - column 11, line 17; figures 1-3 *; | [X]WO0227620 (SILICON ENERGY COMPANY [US]) [X] 1-32 * abstract * * page 2, line 5 - page 3, line 15 * * page 4, line 2 - page 7, line 23; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2004044807 (SINGAPORE INST OF MFG TECHNOLO [SG], et al) [A] 1-32 * abstract ** page 4, line 29 - page 6, line 29 * |