EP1535687 - Electro-erosion method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2010/29] |
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alt, Erhard Ringstr. 3 96117, Memmelsdorf / DE | 02 /
Hohmann, Eugen Schaumbergstr. 9 96191, Viereth-Trunstadt / DE | 03 /
Dieterle, Martin Dorfstr. 32 71636, Ludwigsburg / DE | [2005/22] | Application number, filing date | 04105469.3 | 03.11.2004 | [2005/22] | Priority number, date | DE2003155908 | 29.11.2003 Original published format: DE 10355908 | [2005/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1535687 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1535687 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | [2005/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1535687 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B23H7/26, B23H7/30 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
B23H7/26 (EP);
B23H7/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [2006/34] |
Former [2005/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Erodieren | [2005/22] | English: | Electro-erosion method and apparatus | [2005/22] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour usinage par érosion. | [2005/22] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 13.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS56146627 ; | [X]JPH0360928 ; | [X]JPH04331026 ; | [XY]US3758739 (VAN OSENBRUGGEN C, et al) [X] 1-4,6-9 * the whole document * [Y] 5,10,11 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820220), vol. 006, no. 029, Database accession no. (M - 113), & JP56146627 A 19811114 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 5,10,11 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910531), vol. 015, no. 215, Database accession no. (M - 1119), & JP03060928 A 19910315 (SODICK CO LTD; others: 01) [X] 1-4,6-9 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930402), vol. 017, no. 172, Database accession no. (M - 1392), & JP04331026 A 19921118 (FANUC LTD) [X] 1-4,6-9 * abstract * |