EP1533569 - Method for operating a furnace [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Technology GmbH Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/07] | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garay, Mauricio Stadtbachstrasse 11 5400, Baden / CH | 02 /
Guhl, Ingmar, Willi, Erich Im Roggebode 9 5400, Baden / CH | 03 /
Reiss, Frank Eichendorffstrasse 12 79787, Lauchringen / DE | [2016/07] |
Former [2005/21] | 01 /
Garay, Mauricio Stadtbachstrasse 11 5400, Baden / CH | ||
02 /
Guhl, Ingmar, Willi, Erich Im Roggebode 9 5400, Baden / CH | |||
03 /
Reiss, Frank Eichendorffstrasse 12 79787, Lauchringen / DE | Representative(s) | General Electric Technology GmbH Global Patent Operation - Europe Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/07] | General Electric Technology GmbH CHTI Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 04105548.4 | 05.11.2004 | [2005/21] | Priority number, date | EP20030104292 | 20.11.2003 Original published format: EP 03104292 | CH20030002190 | 19.12.2003 Original published format: CH 21902003 | [2005/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1533569 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1533569 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F23M20/00 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
F23M20/005 (EP);
F02C9/34 (EP);
F05D2240/35 (EP);
F05D2260/96 (EP);
F05D2270/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/21] | F23M13/00, F23N5/16, F02C9/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/07] |
Former [2005/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betrieb einer Feuerungseinrichtung | [2005/21] | English: | Method for operating a furnace | [2005/21] | French: | Méthode de fonctionnement d'un appareil de combustion | [2005/37] |
Former [2005/21] | Méthode de fonctionnement d'un appareil de combustion | Examination procedure | 11.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 28.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.11.2004 | CY | 17.02.2016 | CZ | 17.02.2016 | DK | 17.02.2016 | EE | 17.02.2016 | ES | 17.02.2016 | FI | 17.02.2016 | IS | 17.02.2016 | MC | 17.02.2016 | NL | 17.02.2016 | PL | 17.02.2016 | RO | 17.02.2016 | SE | 17.02.2016 | SI | 17.02.2016 | SK | 17.02.2016 | TR | 17.02.2016 | BG | 17.05.2016 | GR | 18.05.2016 | PT | 17.06.2016 | AT | 05.11.2016 | IE | 05.11.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 05.11.2004 | |
CY | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
TR | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
AT | 05.11.2016 | ||
IE | 05.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 05.11.2004 | |
CY | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
AT | 05.11.2016 | ||
IE | 05.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 17.02.2016 | |
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
AT | 05.11.2016 | ||
IE | 05.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 17.02.2016 | |
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
IE | 05.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | CZ | 17.02.2016 | |
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 17.02.2016 | |
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 17.02.2016 | |
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 17.02.2016 | |
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | ES | 17.02.2016 | |
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 17.02.2016 | |
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 17.02.2016 | |
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07260139 ; | [A]US3388862 (GABRIELSON JAMES E) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US5533329 (OHYAMA YOSHISHIGE [JP], et al) [X] 1,7-9,11,12,14,16,17 * column 5, line 50 - column 7, line 67 * * column 10, line 49 - column 11, line 4; figures 1-5,8,15; claims 1,7,8 *; | [A]EP0962704 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]DE19934612 (ABB ALSTOM POWER CH AG [CH]) [A] 10 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO0196785 (ALSTOM SWITZERLAND LTD [CH], et al) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1180646 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1,5-9,11-14,17 * paragraphs [0054] - [0065] - [0068] - [0075]; figures 2-4 *; | [X]EP1205653 (ALSTOM POWER NV [NL]) [X] 1,5,6,11,12,14 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023]; figure 2 *; | [X]WO02061335 (ALSTOM SWITZERLAND LTD [CH], et al) [X] 1,5,6,10-12,14,17 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP07260139 A 19951013 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0620362 | US5533329 | EP1180646 | EP1205653 | WO02061335 |