EP1533863 - An Active Antenna [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAE, Bum-youl 304-15 Galma 1-dong, Seo-gu Daejeon / KR | [2005/21] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | ||
Former [2005/21] | Geary, Stuart Lloyd, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 04105903.1 | 18.11.2004 | [2005/21] | Priority number, date | KR20030082230 | 19.11.2003 Original published format: KR 2003082230 | [2005/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1533863 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/00, H01Q9/00, H01Q23/00, H03H7/38 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
H03H7/38 (EP,US);
H01Q23/00 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2006/07] |
Former [2005/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Aktive Antenne | [2005/21] | English: | An Active Antenna | [2005/21] | French: | Antenne active | [2005/21] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 26.11.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/26] | 03.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.01.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - "Communications: radio wave antennas", 30-06-2000, Retrieved on 01-03-2005, URL: http://www.uspto.gov/web/offices/ac/ido/oeip/taf/def/343.htm, XP002319668 [X] 1-20 * pages 1-4 * | [A] - HARRISON C W JR, "Monopole with inductive loading", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION, USA, (196307), vol. AP-11, no. 4, pages 394 - 400, XP002319669 [A] 1,6,14,18 * abstract * * page 1, columns 1-2 * * page 3, column 2 * * page 6, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TAP.1963.1138059 | [A] - TAGUCHI M; WAKIMOTO Y; KOMINE I; TANAKA K, "Active dipole antenna for television receiver", PROCEEDINGS OF IEEE ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM AND URSI NATIONAL RADIO SCIENCE MEETING, NEW YORK, USA, (1994), vol. 1, pages 636 - 639, XP002319671 [A] 1,8,9,14,18 * abstract * * pages 636-638 * | [A] - AZADEGAN R; SARABANDI K, "Design of miniaturized slot antennas", IEEE ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM., PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (2001), vol. 4, pages 565 - 568, XP002319672 [A] 1,6,9,14,18 * abstract * * pages 565-567 * |