EP1659459 - Protection device for the access to the winding mechanism of a pocket watch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Manufacture Favre & Perret S.A. Rue du Crêt du Locle 12C 2322 Le Crêt du Locle / CH | [2006/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Della Santa, Richard Prairie 40 2300, La Chaux-de-Fonds / CH | [2006/21] | Representative(s) | Couillard, Yann Luc Raymond ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/44] | Couillard, Yann Luc Raymond ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2010/12] | Vigand, Philippe ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2006/21] | Vigand, Philippe, et al ICB, Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA, Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 04105981.7 | 22.11.2004 | [2006/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1659459 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1659459 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G04B3/02, G04B37/08 | [2006/21] | CPC: |
G04B3/02 (EP,US);
G04B37/081 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/21] | Title | German: | Schutzvorrichtung für den Zugang der Aufzugseinrichtung einer Taschenuhr | [2006/21] | English: | Protection device for the access to the winding mechanism of a pocket watch | [2006/21] | French: | Dispositif de protection pour l'accès au mécanisme de remontage d'une montre de poche | [2006/21] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 24.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.11.2010 | CY | 10.11.2010 | CZ | 10.11.2010 | DK | 10.11.2010 | EE | 10.11.2010 | FI | 10.11.2010 | IE | 10.11.2010 | IT | 10.11.2010 | NL | 10.11.2010 | PL | 10.11.2010 | RO | 10.11.2010 | SE | 10.11.2010 | SI | 10.11.2010 | SK | 10.11.2010 | TR | 10.11.2010 | LU | 22.11.2010 | BE | 30.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | BG | 10.02.2011 | GR | 11.02.2011 | ES | 21.02.2011 | IS | 10.03.2011 | PT | 10.03.2011 | HU | 11.05.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 10.11.2010 | ||
IT | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
LU | 22.11.2010 | ||
BE | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
HU | 11.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 10.11.2010 | ||
IT | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BE | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
HU | 11.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 10.11.2010 | ||
IT | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BE | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BE | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 10.11.2010 | |
IS | 10.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE32449 (GEBRÜDER YUNGHANS) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US156356 (F. JACOT) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [XA]FR2113765 (BARDIAU HENRY) [X] 1 * figures 2,4,5,9,11 * * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 11 * [A] 2-11 | by applicant | DE32449 |