EP1659472 - Method and Device for Authenticating Software [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2006/21] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Little, Herbert A. 504 Old Oak Place N2T 2V8, Waterloo / CA | 02 /
Hickey, Ryan J. 5 Father David Bauer Drive, Unit 202 N2L 6M2, Waterloo / CA | [2006/21] | Representative(s) | Rickard, David John, et al Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Rickard, David John, et al Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | ||
Former [2006/21] | Rickard, David John, et al 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 04105984.1 | 22.11.2004 | [2006/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1659472 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00, G06F12/14 | [2006/21] | CPC: |
G06F21/575 (EP,US);
G06F21/51 (EP,US);
G06F12/1416 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/21] | Extension states | AL | 14.12.2004 | HR | 14.12.2004 | LT | 14.12.2004 | LV | 14.12.2004 | MK | 14.12.2004 | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Authentifizierung von Software | [2006/21] | English: | Method and Device for Authenticating Software | [2006/21] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'authentication d'un logiciel | [2006/21] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2004 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 11.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AY]EP0816970 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,3,5 * claim 9 * * claim 15 * [Y] 2,4; | [Y]EP0961193 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [Y] 1-6 * page 6, column 9, line 29, paragraph 28 - column 10, line 43, paragraph 31; figure 5 *; | [A]US2002144104 (SPRINGFIELD RANDALL SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-6* paragraph [0022] *; | [Y]US6587947 (O'DONNELL AMY [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * column 2, line 8 - line 20 * * column 4, line 36 - line 42 * * column 4, line 56 - line 59 * * column 5, line 22 - line 26 * * figures 2,4,6 *; | [A]WO03060670 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 8, line 3 - line 9; figure 2 *; | [Y] - ANDREW "BUNNIE" HUANG, Hacking the Xbox, SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA, NO STARCH PRESS INC., (2003), XP002335696 [Y] 1-6 * page 104, paragraph 2 * * page 142 - page 143 * | [A] - SMITH S W ET AL, "Building a high-performance, programmable secure coprocessor", COMPUTER NETWORKS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990423), vol. 31, no. 8, ISSN 1389-1286, pages 831 - 860, XP004304521 [A] 1-6 * page 833, column R, line 22 - line 25 * * page 835, column R, line 9 - page 836, column L, line 35 * * page 839, column L, line 8 * * page 844, column L, line 29 - column R, line 24; figure 8 * * page 846, column R, line 16 - line 19 * * page 850, column L, line 30 - column R, line 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1389-1286(98)00019-X |