EP1536122 - Drive device for inductive electroactuators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino, 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states C.R.F. SOCIETÀ CONSORTILE PER AZIONI Strada Torino, 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | ||
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino, 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANZONE, Alberto Strada Cauda 13 12051 ALBA / IT | 02 /
SANTERO, Paolo c/o C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino 50 10043 ORBASSANO / IT | 03 /
GROPPO, Riccardo Via Costa 83 10060 ROLETTO / IT | [2005/22] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/22] | Jorio, Paolo, Dr. Ing., et al Studio Torta S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 04106051.8 | 24.11.2004 | [2005/22] | Priority number, date | IT2003TO00938 | 25.11.2003 Original published format: IT TO20030938 | [2005/22] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1536122 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1536122 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | [2005/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1536122 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/26, F02D41/20 | [2005/52] | CPC: |
F02D41/20 (EP,US);
F02D41/2487 (EP,US);
F02D41/266 (EP,US);
F02D2041/2006 (EP,US);
F02D2041/2058 (EP,US);
F02D2041/2072 (EP,US);
H01H47/325 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/22] | F02D41/20, H03K17/08, H01H47/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/22] | Title | German: | Steuerungsvorrichtung für induktive Elektroantriebe | [2005/22] | English: | Drive device for inductive electroactuators | [2005/22] | French: | Dispositif de pilotage pour actionneurs inductifs | [2005/22] | Examination procedure | 03.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/48] | 23.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.05.2008 | BE | 14.05.2008 | CY | 14.05.2008 | CZ | 14.05.2008 | DK | 14.05.2008 | EE | 14.05.2008 | FI | 14.05.2008 | NL | 14.05.2008 | PL | 14.05.2008 | RO | 14.05.2008 | SI | 14.05.2008 | SK | 14.05.2008 | BG | 14.08.2008 | SE | 14.08.2008 | GR | 15.08.2008 | ES | 25.08.2008 | IS | 14.09.2008 | PT | 14.10.2008 | HU | 15.11.2008 | GB | 24.11.2008 | IE | 24.11.2008 | LU | 24.11.2008 | CH | 30.11.2008 | LI | 30.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | [2010/50] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CY | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
HU | 15.11.2008 | ||
GB | 24.11.2008 | ||
IE | 24.11.2008 | ||
LU | 24.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
GB | 24.11.2008 | ||
IE | 24.11.2008 | ||
LU | 24.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
GB | 24.11.2008 | ||
IE | 24.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
IE | 24.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
IE | 24.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | SI | 14.05.2008 | |
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 14.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3515040 (KLOECKNER WOLFGANG DR [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 1 - page 4, paragraph 3 * * page 6, paragraph 2 *; | [DA]EP0924589 (FIAT RICERCHE [IT]) [DA] 1-10 * column W *; | [A]EP0943909 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0006] , [0010] - [0016] * * figure 2 *; | [A]US2002089883 (PEPI ALESSANDRO [IT], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0009] , [0026] , [0027] *; | [A]US2002179059 (AOKI TSUNEAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* figure 1 * |