EP1667301 - Maritime power supply system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IPALCO B.V. Ohmweg 17 2952 BD Alblasserdam / NL | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Popesco, Ottonel Via Giovanni XXIII, 2 Vedano al Lambro 20057 / IT | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Lambert, Romain Ramon, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. 234, route d'Arlon B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | Lambert, Romain Ramon, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A., 234, route d'Arlon, B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | Application number, filing date | 04106227.4 | 01.12.2004 | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1667301 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H02G11/02 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
B63J3/04 (EP,US);
H02J4/00 (EP,US);
B63J2003/043 (EP,US);
H02J2310/42 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T90/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/07] |
Former [2006/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Seestromversorgungssystem | [2006/23] | English: | Maritime power supply system | [2006/23] | French: | Système d'alimentation électrique maritime | [2006/23] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/34] | 04.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.01.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.01.2007 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3602730 (CUSHING CHARLES R) [A] 1,12 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2647604 (ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1,12* the whole document *; | [A]US2004195066 (WIDEGREN MICHAEL [DE]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * |