EP1538533 - Improved FFT/IFFT processor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Pvt. Ltd. Plot No. 1, Knowledge Park III 201308 Greater Noida, Uttar Pradesh / IN | [2008/01] |
Former [2005/23] | For:DE
FR
GB
IT
STMicroelectronics Pvt. Ltd Plot No. 2 & 3, Sector 16A, Institutional Area Noida 201 301, Uttar Pradesh / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saha, Kaushik A2 Staff Flats, I.P. College Shamnath Marg Dehli - 110 054 / IN | 02 /
Maiti, Srijib Narayan R-5/1, Duk Bungalow Road Saratpalli Midnapore - 721 101 West Bengal / IN | 03 /
Cornero, Marco Via Volta, 43 22100 Como / IT | [2005/23] | Representative(s) | Cerbaro, Elena, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2014/44] |
Former [2013/23] | Bergadano, Mirko, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2008/45] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2005/23] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 04106295.1 | 03.12.2004 | [2005/23] | Priority number, date | IN2003DEL1520 | 05.12.2003 Original published format: IN DE15202003 | [2005/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1538533 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1538533 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | [2006/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/14 | [2005/23] | CPC: |
G06F17/142 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/43] |
Former [2005/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verbesserter FFT/IFFT-Prozessor | [2005/23] | English: | Improved FFT/IFFT processor | [2005/23] | French: | Processeur FFT/IFFT amélioré | [2005/23] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/40] | 01.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/49] | 27.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0169424 (JABER ASSOCIATES L L C [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 6, line 14 - page 7, line 20 * * page 16, line 19 - page 17, line 2; figure 10 *; | [PX]EP1447752 (ST MICROELECTRONICS PVT LTD [IN]) [PX] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X] - CHU E ET AL, Inside the FFT Black Box: Serial and Parallel Fast Fourier Transform Algorithms, CRC PRESS LLC, (2000), XP002360703 [X] 1-8 * chapter 8 (page 69 - page 79) * * chapter 17 (page 177 - page 182) * * sections 19.2.3, 19.2.4, 19.3 (page 209 - page 210) * * section 21.1.3 (page 226) * | [DX] - PIEDRA R M, Parallel 1-D FFT Implementation With TMS320C4x DSPs, TEXAS INSTRUMENTS, APPLICATION REPORT SPRA108, (199402), XP002360704 [DX] 1-8 * section "Parallel DIT FFT" (page 7 - page 11) * * section "B) Decimation-in-Time (DIT) FFT" (page 16 - page 17) * | [A] - DAWOUD D S, "An effective memory addressing scheme for multiprocessor FFT system", 2002 6TH. IEEE AFRICON CONFERENCE. UNIVERSITY OF PRETORIA, GEORGE, SOUTH AFRICA, 2-4 OCTOBER 2002, IEEE, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20021002), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-7570-X, pages 29 - 34, XP010621641 [A] 1-8 * section 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AFRCON.2002.1146801 | [A] - DAWOUD D S, "New hardware implementation of parallel 1D FFT", 2002 6TH. IEEE AFRICON CONFERENCE. UNIVERSITY OF PRETORIA, GEORGE, SOUTH AFRICA, 2-4 OCTOBER 2002, IEEE, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20021002), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-7570-X, pages 35 - 40, XP010621642 [A] 1-8 * section 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AFRCON.2002.1146802 |