EP1544482 - Screw to be used with window or door profiles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/25] | screw to be used with window or door profiles | ||
[2008/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SFS intec Holding AG Nefenstrasse 30 9435 Heerbrugg / CH | [2008/01] |
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states SFS intec Holding AG Nefenstrasse 30 9435 Heerbrugg / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sieber, Alex Falkenweg 13 9434 Au / CH | [2005/25] | Application number, filing date | 04106493.2 | 13.12.2004 | [2005/25] | Priority number, date | DE2003219690U | 18.12.2003 Original published format: DE 20319690 U | [2005/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1544482 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1544482 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16B35/04, F16B25/10 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
F16B25/103 (EP);
F16B25/0021 (EP);
F16B35/04 (EP);
E05D5/023 (EP);
E05Y2800/682 (EP);
E05Y2900/132 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/01] |
Former [2005/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schraube für den Einsatz bei Fenster- oder Türprofilen | [2005/25] | English: | Screw to be used with window or door profiles | [2008/01] | French: | Vis destinée à des profilés de fenêtre ou de porte | [2005/25] |
Former [2005/25] | screw to be used with window or door profiles | Examination procedure | 07.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 23.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.01.2008 | CZ | 02.01.2008 | DK | 02.01.2008 | EE | 02.01.2008 | FI | 02.01.2008 | GB | 02.01.2008 | IE | 02.01.2008 | IT | 02.01.2008 | LT | 02.01.2008 | NL | 02.01.2008 | PL | 02.01.2008 | RO | 02.01.2008 | SI | 02.01.2008 | SK | 02.01.2008 | TR | 02.01.2008 | BG | 02.04.2008 | SE | 02.04.2008 | GR | 03.04.2008 | ES | 13.04.2008 | IS | 02.05.2008 | PT | 02.06.2008 | HU | 03.07.2008 | [2010/50] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 02.01.2008 | |
CZ | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
EE | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
GB | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
IT | 02.01.2008 | ||
LT | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
PL | 02.01.2008 | ||
RO | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
TR | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
IS | 02.05.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
HU | 03.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 02.01.2008 | |
CZ | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
EE | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
GB | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
IT | 02.01.2008 | ||
LT | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
PL | 02.01.2008 | ||
RO | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
IS | 02.05.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
HU | 03.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CY | 02.01.2008 | |
CZ | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
EE | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
GB | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
IT | 02.01.2008 | ||
LT | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
PL | 02.01.2008 | ||
RO | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
IS | 02.05.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 02.01.2008 | |
CZ | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
EE | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
GB | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
LT | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
PL | 02.01.2008 | ||
RO | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
IS | 02.05.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 02.01.2008 | |
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
EE | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
GB | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
LT | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
PL | 02.01.2008 | ||
RO | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
IS | 02.05.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | CZ | 02.01.2008 | |
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
GB | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
LT | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
PL | 02.01.2008 | ||
RO | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
IS | 02.05.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | CZ | 02.01.2008 | |
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
LT | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
PL | 02.01.2008 | ||
RO | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
IS | 02.05.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 02.01.2008 | |
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
LT | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
PL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
IS | 02.05.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 02.01.2008 | |
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LT | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
PL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
IS | 02.05.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | FI | 02.01.2008 | |
LT | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
PL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
IS | 02.05.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 02.01.2008 | |
LT | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
IS | 02.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 02.01.2008 | |
LT | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
IS | 02.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | NL | 02.01.2008 | |
SI | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | SI | 02.01.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE9405595U (ITW BEFESTIGUNGSSYSTEME [DE]) [Y] 1,3,5,6 * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 1 * * page 7, paragraph L - page 8, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [Y] - "electronic catalog", METRIC SCREW TOOL COMPANY, WAKEFIELD - MA 01880 - USA, (1999), URL: http://www.metricscrew-toolco.com, (20050225), XP002319244 [Y] 1,3,5,6 * page 203 * |