EP1544615 - Method and apparatus for monitoring fault gas in liquid filled high voltage units [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.09.2006 [2006/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bräsel, Eckhard An der Klosterruine 14a 17493 Greifswald / DE | [2005/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/25] | Representative(s) | Garrels, Sabine, et al Schnick & Garrels Schonenfahrerstrasse 7 18057 Rostock / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/25] | Garrels, Sabine, et al Schnick & Garrels, Patentanwälte, Schonenfahrerstrasse 7 18057 Rostock / DE | Application number, filing date | 04106535.0 | 14.12.2004 | [2005/25] | Priority number, date | DE2003159143 | 16.12.2003 Original published format: DE 10359143 | DE20041054195 | 10.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004054195 | [2005/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1544615 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/28 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
G01N33/2841 (EP);
H01F27/14 (EP);
H01F27/402 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/11] |
Former [2005/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Fehlergasüberwachung in flüssigkeitsgefüllten Hochspannungsanlagen | [2005/25] | English: | Method and apparatus for monitoring fault gas in liquid filled high voltage units | [2005/25] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour surveiller le gaz de défaut dans un dispositif à haute tension rempli de liquide | [2005/25] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/37] | 26.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.01.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.01.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.01.2006 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]DD148688 (KOEPPEN HERMANN, et al) [DY] 1,3,4,7,8,10 * abstract *; | [Y]DE10122173 (BRAESEL ECKHARD [DE]) [Y] 1,3,4,7-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0032] , [0041] , [0049] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0071] *; | [YA]DE10063408 (BRAESEL ECKHARD [DE]) [Y] 9 * abstract * [A] 2,5,6; | [A]WO03075294 (KOHLI ANIL [IN]) [A] 1,3* abstract * |