EP1671774 - Apparatus for the reduction of PET bottles volume [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Egger, Ueli Vicolo Fortezze 8 6612 Ascona / CH | [2006/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/25] | Representative(s) | Scheuzger, Beat Otto Bovard AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | Scheuzger, Beat Otto Bovard AG Patentanwälte VSP Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 04106682.0 | 17.12.2004 | [2006/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1671774 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B29B17/00, B30B9/32 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
B30B9/321 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/25] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Verringern des Volumens von PET-Flaschen | [2006/25] | English: | Apparatus for the reduction of PET bottles volume | [2006/25] | French: | Dispositif pour la réduction du volume des bouteilles en PET | [2006/25] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 19.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/44] | 08.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AY]JP2000301387 ; | [A]US1975013 (MINNICH SIMON B) [A] 1-7* figure - *; | [Y]DE9004989U (ALBERS, WILHELM, 4472 HAREN, DE) [Y] 2-7 * figure -; claim - *; | [XY]US5448946 (LAUX WILLIAM R [US]) [X] 1,10 * column 2, line 48 - line 58; figure - * [Y] 2-9; | [X]US5832818 (MENZAK JR JOSEPH [US]) [X] 1,2,10 * abstract *; | [XY]FR2795362 (BIGOT ALAIN [FR]) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 8; | [X]US2002023552 (YAMAGUCHI MASAO [JP]) [X] 1,10 * abstract *; | [X]US6571696 (ADAM CLAUDE [BE]) [X] 1,10 * abstract * | [AY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010205), vol. 2000, no. 13, & JP2000301387 A 20001031 (TAKEDA MASAHARU) [A] 1,2 * abstract * [Y] 9 |