EP1443179 - A rotor comprising retaining plates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/32] | A rotor and a retaining plate for the same | ||
[2008/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states ROLLS-ROYCE PLC 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | ||
Former [2004/32] | For all designated states ROLLS-ROYCE plc 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Udell, David Charles 35 Rykneld Road Littleover Derby DE23 7BG / GB | 02 /
Kee, Alan 3 Lockwood Close Beeston Rylands Nottingham NG9 1NP / GB | [2004/32] | Representative(s) | Gunn, Michael Alan Rolls-Royce plc Patents Department P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [2009/40] |
Former [2004/32] | Gunn, Michael Alan Intellectual Property Dpt ML 9, Rolls-Royce plc P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04250077.7 | 09.01.2004 | [2004/32] | Priority number, date | GB20030002116 | 30.01.2003 Original published format: GB 0302116 | [2004/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1443179 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1443179 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | [2006/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1443179 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/30 | [2004/32] | CPC: |
F01D5/3015 (EP,US);
F05D2250/314 (EP,US);
F05D2260/30 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/36] |
Former [2004/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ein Rotor mit Schaufelhalteplatten | [2008/41] | English: | A rotor comprising retaining plates | [2008/41] | French: | Un rotor comportant des plaques de rétention | [2008/41] |
Former [2004/32] | Rotor sowie seine Schaufelhalteplatte | ||
Former [2004/32] | A rotor and a retaining plate for the same | ||
Former [2004/32] | Rotor et sa plaque de maintien | Examination procedure | 12.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 15.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/06] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.08.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB906476 (FAIRWEATHER HAROLD G C) [X] 1,2,6,7,10 * page 2, lines 23-79 * * page 2, line 109 - page 3, line 2 * * figure 1 *; | [X]FR2603333 (SNECMA [FR]) [X] 1-10 * page 5, lines 9-24 * * page 6, lines 1-17 * * page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 4 * * page 7, line 33 - page 8, line 4 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0761930 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 2,6,7,10 * column 3, lines 21-32 * * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 20 * * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 10 ** figure 3 *; | [X]GB2313162 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1,2,6,7,10 * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 15 * * figure 1 * |