EP1553797 - Apparatus and method for implementing detection of system information changes in universal mobile telecommunications systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states Research in Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2007/21] | For all designated states M-Stack Limited Chancery House, 8 Edward Street Birmingham B1 2RX / GB | ||
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states M-Stack Limited Chancery House, 8 Edward Street Birmingham B1 2RX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roberts, Gideon 52 Station Road Stone Staffordshire ST15 8ES / GB | 02 /
Farnsworth, Andy 35 Ashgrove Close Marlbrook Bromsgrove Worcs B60 1HW / GB | [2005/28] | Representative(s) | Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04250097.5 | 09.01.2004 | [2005/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1553797 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1553797 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1553797 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | [2008/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
H04W48/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/28] | Extension states | AL | 13.01.2006 | LT | 13.01.2006 | LV | 13.01.2006 | MK | 13.01.2006 | Title | German: | Gerät und Verfahren zur Implementierung der Erfassung von Systeminformationsänderungen in universellen mobilen Telekommunikationssystemen | [2005/28] | English: | Apparatus and method for implementing detection of system information changes in universal mobile telecommunications systems | [2005/28] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour mettre en oeuvre de la détection de changement d'informations de système dans un système universel de télécommunications mobiles | [2005/28] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 13.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.05.2007 | BE | 23.05.2007 | CH | 23.05.2007 | CY | 23.05.2007 | CZ | 23.05.2007 | DK | 23.05.2007 | EE | 23.05.2007 | FI | 23.05.2007 | LI | 23.05.2007 | NL | 23.05.2007 | RO | 23.05.2007 | SI | 23.05.2007 | SK | 23.05.2007 | TR | 23.05.2007 | BG | 23.08.2007 | SE | 23.08.2007 | GR | 24.08.2007 | PT | 23.10.2007 | HU | 24.11.2007 | IE | 09.01.2008 | LU | 09.01.2008 | MC | 31.01.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
CY | 23.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
EE | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
RO | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SK | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
HU | 24.11.2007 | ||
IE | 09.01.2008 | ||
LU | 09.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
CY | 23.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
EE | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
RO | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SK | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
IE | 09.01.2008 | ||
LU | 09.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
CY | 23.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
EE | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
RO | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SK | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
IE | 09.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
EE | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
RO | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SK | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
IE | 09.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
RO | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SK | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
IE | 09.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
RO | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SK | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
RO | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SK | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SK | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SK | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CH | 23.05.2007 | |
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SE | 23.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5404355 (RAITH ALEX K [US]) [X] 1,4-7 * column 8, line 67 - column 9, line 20 * * column 9, line 61 - column 10, line 8 * * column 14, line 62 - column 15, line 26 * * column 15, line 55 - column 16, line 26 * * column 16, line 42 - column 17, line 9 *[Y] 2,3; | [XY]WO0072609 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1,4-7 * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 22 * * page 11, line 6 - line 19 * * page 12, line 10 - page 15, line 25 * * page 19, line 18 - page 20, line 12 * * figure 10 * [Y] 2,3 |