Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] |
03.08.2009 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
31.07.2009 | Definitive list of designations | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] |
03.03.2009 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
28.11.2008 | Publication of search report | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] |
26.10.2007 | Change: Renewal fee paid | |
26.10.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.10.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
26.01.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.06.2004 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] |
04.06.2004 | Request for examination filed | published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] |