EP1439521 - Method and display apparatus of providing advance screen saver warning [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong,Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/30] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong,Youngdungpo-Gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeong, Seok Hwa 202-1005, Woo-Bang Shinsegae Town Sangmo-dong Gumi-si Gyeongsangbuk-do / KR | [2004/30] | Representative(s) | Hale, Peter, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/30] | Hale, Peter, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04250148.6 | 14.01.2004 | [2004/30] | Priority number, date | KR20030002712 | 15.01.2003 Original published format: KR 2003002712 | [2004/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1439521 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1439521 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/00 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
G09G5/003 (EP,US);
G06F3/14 (KR);
G09G2320/046 (EP,US);
G09G2330/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2009/36] |
Former [2004/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anzeigevorrichtung zum Bereitstellen einer Bildschirmschonerwarnung im Voraus | [2004/30] | English: | Method and display apparatus of providing advance screen saver warning | [2004/30] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage pour mettre en place un avertissement d'un économiseur d'écran par avance | [2004/30] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/30] | 02.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/53] | 10.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0223295 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-34* the whole document *; | [X] - "HARDWARE MONITOR SECURITY FEATURE", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19890801), vol. 32, no. 3A, ISSN 0018-8689, page 284/285, XP000049463 [X] 1-34 * the whole document * |