EP1439034 - Hand-held power tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SP Air Kabusiki Kaisha 325-2, Mure, Kamiminochi Nagano Pref. 389-12 / JP | [2004/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kusama, Masahiko 1052 Crosswinds Court Wentzville Missouri 63385 / US | [2004/30] | Representative(s) | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/30] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen W.P. Thompson & Co, 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04250197.3 | 16.01.2004 | [2004/30] | Priority number, date | US20030346334 | 17.01.2003 Original published format: US 346334 | [2004/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1439034 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B25B21/00 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
B25B21/004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/15] |
Former [2004/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kraftgetriebenes Handwerkzeug | [2004/30] | English: | Hand-held power tool | [2004/30] | French: | Outil à main motorisé | [2004/30] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/45] | 08.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.03.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.03.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.03.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 01.03.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 01.03.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 01.03.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 01.03.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.03.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.03.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.03.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 01.03.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.03.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.03.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 01.03.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.03.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.03.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.03.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.03.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.03.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 01.03.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 01.03.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.03.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 01.03.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.03.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.03.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.03.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 01.03.2005 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4346630 (HANSON ANTHONY) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [YD]US4722252 (FULCHER WILLIAM A [US], et al) [YD] 1-14 * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 10; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0285888 (CHICAGO PNEUMATIC TOOL CO [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5142952 (PUTNEY GORDON A [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [YD]US5535646 (ALLEN KENNETH D [US], et al) [YD] 1-14 * column 3, line 46 - line 60; figures 6,7,9 * |