EP1441502 - Recording and reproduction apparatus and method for imperceptible information to be embedded in digital image data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JVC KENWOOD Corporation 12, Moriya-cho 3-chome Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | [2012/16] |
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LTD. 12, Moriya-Cho 3-Chome, Kanagawa-Ku Yokohama-Shi, Kanagawa-Ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugahara, Takayuki 3-23-7-1-702, Hon-Cho Yokosuka-Shi Kanagawa-Ken / JP | 02 /
Nishitani, Masayoshi 2-31-26-101, Uragami-Dai Yokosuka-Shi Kanagawa-Ken / JP | 03 /
Ueda, Kenjiro 321-16-305, Yabe-Cho Totsuka-Ku Yokohama-Shi Kanagawa-Ken / JP | [2004/31] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/31] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 04250237.7 | 19.01.2004 | [2004/31] | Priority number, date | JP20030012544 | 21.01.2003 Original published format: JP 2003012544 | [2004/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1441502 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1441502 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/32 | [2004/31] | CPC: |
H04N1/32144 (EP,US);
H04N2201/327 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/20] |
Former [2004/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungs- und Wiedergabegerät und Verfahren zur unsichtbare Informationseinbettung in Bilddaten | [2004/31] | English: | Recording and reproduction apparatus and method for imperceptible information to be embedded in digital image data | [2004/31] | French: | Appareil et méthode d'enregistrement et reproduction pour l'incrustation d'information imperceptible dans des données d'image | [2004/31] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 12.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/01] | 29.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2002044429 ; | [A]JP2002223348 ; | [A]WO9841017 (CENTRAL RESEARCH LAB LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]US6141441 (CASS TODD A [US], et al) [A] 1-6* abstract *; | [A]US2002021823 (MURATANI HIROFUMI [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020604), vol. 2002, no. 06, & JP2002044429 A 20020208 (KOWA CO) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20021212), vol. 2002, no. 12, & JP2002223348 A 20020809 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract * |