EP1459706 - Stent delivery system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cordis Corporation 14201 N.W. 60th Avenue Miami Lakes Florida 33014 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | For all designated states Cordis Corporation 14201 N.W. 60th Avenue Miami Lakes Florida 33014 / US | ||
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states Cordis Corporation 14201 N.W. 60th Avenue Miami Lakes Florida 33014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jackson, Karen Paulette 2250 NW 139th Street Opa-Locka, FL 33054 / US | 02 /
Widenhouse, Christopher William 610 S.W. 164th Avenue Pembroke Pines, FL 33027 / US | [2004/39] | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2004/39] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04250327.6 | 22.01.2004 | [2004/39] | Priority number, date | US20030350397 | 23.01.2003 Original published format: US 350397 | [2004/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1459706 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1459706 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
A61F2/95 (EP,US);
A61F2/9522 (EP,US);
A61F2/9526 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/39] | Title | German: | Stentanbringungssystem | [2004/39] | English: | Stent delivery system | [2004/39] | French: | Système de mise en place d'un stent | [2004/39] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 23.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.10.2009 | CY | 28.10.2009 | CZ | 28.10.2009 | DK | 28.10.2009 | EE | 28.10.2009 | FI | 28.10.2009 | RO | 28.10.2009 | SE | 28.10.2009 | SI | 28.10.2009 | SK | 28.10.2009 | TR | 28.10.2009 | LU | 22.01.2010 | BG | 28.01.2010 | GR | 29.01.2010 | MC | 31.01.2010 | ES | 08.02.2010 | PT | 01.03.2010 | HU | 29.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
LU | 22.01.2010 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
GR | 29.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
HU | 29.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
GR | 29.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
HU | 29.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
GR | 29.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 28.10.2009 | |
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 28.10.2009 | |
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 28.10.2009 | |
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 08.02.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0916318 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,3* the whole document *; | [A]US6132458 (STAEHLE BRADFORD G [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1025813 |