EP1441141 - Disc brake pad backplate assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meritor Heavy Vehicle Braking Systems (UK) Limited Grange Road Cwmbran Gwent NP44 3XU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states Meritor Heavy Vehicle Braking Systems (UK) Limited Grange Road Cwmbran Gwent NP44 3XU / GB | ||
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states Meritor Heavy Vehicle Braking Systems (UK) Limited Grange Road Cwmbran, Gwent NP44 3XU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thomas, Paul Anthony Fernlea, Llanvaches, Caldicot Newport NP26 3AY / GB | [2004/31] | Representative(s) | Jones, John Bryn, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/31] | Jones, John Bryn, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 04250340.9 | 22.01.2004 | [2004/31] | Priority number, date | GB20030001799 | 25.01.2003 Original published format: GB 0301799 | [2004/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1441141 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1441141 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/097 | [2004/31] | CPC: |
F16D65/0977 (EP,US);
F16D65/0978 (EP,US);
F16D2055/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/31] | Title | German: | Scheibenbremsbelaghalterung | [2004/31] | English: | Disc brake pad backplate assembly | [2004/31] | French: | Fixation de garnitures de freins à disque | [2004/31] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 03.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.11.2005 | BE | 30.11.2005 | CH | 30.11.2005 | CY | 30.11.2005 | EE | 30.11.2005 | FI | 30.11.2005 | LI | 30.11.2005 | NL | 30.11.2005 | RO | 30.11.2005 | SI | 30.11.2005 | SK | 30.11.2005 | TR | 30.11.2005 | IE | 23.01.2006 | LU | 31.01.2006 | MC | 31.01.2006 | BG | 28.02.2006 | DK | 28.02.2006 | GR | 28.02.2006 | ES | 13.03.2006 | PT | 02.05.2006 | HU | 01.06.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/38] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
EE | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
RO | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
TR | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 23.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
HU | 01.06.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
EE | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
RO | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 23.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
HU | 01.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
RO | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 23.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
HU | 01.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/43] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IT | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
RO | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 23.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
HU | 01.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 23.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
HU | 01.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 23.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SI | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 23.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/41] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
BG | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SK | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
NL | 30.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0248385 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [DA] 1,9,11 * column 6, line 55 - column 7, line 9 * * column 8, line 23 - line 48; figures 7,8 *; | [DA]WO9200465 (KNORR BREMSE AG [DE]) [DA] 1,9,11 * page 5, paragraph L - page 6, paragraph 1 * * page 7, paragraph 3; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0694707 (PERROT BREMSEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,9,11* column 4, line 5 - line 28; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0877176 (MERITOR HEAVY VEHICLE SYS LTD [US]) [A] 1,9,11 * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 5; figure 1 * |